Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 07/15/2021 at 10:01:16 (UTC).

Mri Associates Of St. Pete,Santos, Samantha vs Garrison Property And Casualty Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 04/16/2021 Mri Associates Of St Pete,Santos, Samantha filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Garrison Property And Casualty Insurance Company. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Costello, Jessica. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7141

  • Filing Date:

    04/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Costello, Jessica

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Mri Associates Of St. Pete D/B/A Saint Pete Mri A/A/O Samantha Santos

701 S. Howard Suite 106-391

Tampa, FL 33606

Mri Associates Of St. Pete

701 S. Howard Suite 106-391

Tampa, FL 33606

Santos, Samantha

SAINT PETE MRI

Defendant

Garrison Property And Casualty Insurance Company

200 E.Gaines St.

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DIVALE , LORCA

Attorney at THE PHYSICIAN COLLECTIONS GROUP P A

701 S Howard Ave Ste 106-391

Tampa, FL 33606

Defendant Attorney

MANCINI, ANGELO ESTEFFANO

Attorney at ROIG LAWYERS

7380 W Sand Lake Rd Ste 600

Orlando, FL 32819-5259

 

Court Documents

AMENDED COMPLAINT

05/05/2021: AMENDED COMPLAINT

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

04/21/2021: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

04/16/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

04/16/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketMOTION FOR PARTIAL JUDGMENT; Comment: AND / OR DISPOSITION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Mri Associates Of St. Pete; Plaintiff: Santos, Samantha; Plaintiff Doing Business As: SAINT PETE MRI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Additional Info: Defendant: Garrison Property And Casualty Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketSTIPULATION; Comment: TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Mri Associates Of St. Pete; Plaintiff: Santos, Samantha; Plaintiff Doing Business As: SAINT PETE MRI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketMOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME; Comment: TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT - **CASE STYLE DOES NOT MATCH AMENDED COMPLAINT**; Additional Info: Defendant: Garrison Property And Casualty Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: Garrison Property And Casualty Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Defendant: Garrison Property And Casualty Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X1; Additional Info: Defendant: Garrison Property And Casualty Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Mri Associates Of St. Pete

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Mri Associates Of St. Pete

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Mri Associates Of St. Pete

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Mri Associates Of St. Pete

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Mri Associates Of St. Pete

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Mri Associates Of St. Pete

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Mri Associates Of St. Pete

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MRI ASSOCIATES OF ST PETE INC AS ASSIGNEE OF- FOR JAVITZ, RUSSELL is a litigant

Latest cases where Garrison Property and Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DIVALE , LORCA