Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 07/15/2021 at 15:37:11 (UTC).

Mri Associates Of St. Pete,REPLOGLE, RYAN vs Garrison Property And Casualty Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 04/16/2021 Mri Associates Of St Pete,REPLOGLE, RYAN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Garrison Property And Casualty Insurance Company. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Moody, James. S and Moody, S. James. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7136

  • Filing Date:

    04/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Moody, James. S

Moody, S. James

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Mri Associates Of St. Pete D/B/A Saint Pete Mri A/A/O Ryan Replogle

701 S. Howard Suite 106-391

Tampa, FL 33606

Mri Associates Of St. Pete

701 S. Howard Suite 106-391

Tampa, FL 33606

REPLOGLE, RYAN

SAINT PETE MRI

Defendant

Garrison Property And Casualty Insurance Company

200 E.Gaines St.

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DIVALE , LORCA

Attorney at THE PHYSICIAN COLLECTIONS GROUP P A

701 S Howard Ave Ste 106-391

Tampa, FL 33606

 

Court Documents

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

04/21/2021: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

04/16/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

04/16/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketAMENDED STATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Mri Associates Of St. Pete

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: Garrison Property And Casualty Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Mri Associates Of St. Pete

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Mri Associates Of St. Pete

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Mri Associates Of St. Pete

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Mri Associates Of St. Pete

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Mri Associates Of St. Pete

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Mri Associates Of St. Pete

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Mri Associates Of St. Pete

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MRI ASSOCIATES OF ST PETE INC AS ASSIGNEE OF- FOR JAVITZ, RUSSELL is a litigant

Latest cases where Garrison Property and Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DIVALE , LORCA