Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 07/09/2021 at 10:09:30 (UTC).

MRI ASSOCIATES OF ST. PETE,Hironaka, Cherlyn vs Garrison Property And Casualty Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 04/16/2021 MRI ASSOCIATES OF ST PETE,Hironaka, Cherlyn filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Garrison Property And Casualty Insurance Company. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Bagge-Hernandez, Michael. C and Bagge-Hernandez, C. Michael. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7139

  • Filing Date:

    04/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Bagge-Hernandez, Michael. C

Bagge-Hernandez, C. Michael

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Mri Associates Of St. Pete D/B/A Saint Pete Mri A/A/O Cherlyn Hironaka

701 S. Howard Suite 106-391

Tampa, FL 33606

MRI ASSOCIATES OF ST. PETE

701 S. Howard Suite 106-391

Tampa, FL 33606

Hironaka, Cherlyn

SAINT PETE MRI

Defendant

Garrison Property And Casualty Insurance Company

200 E.Gaines St.

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DIVALE , LORCA

Attorney at THE PHYSICIAN COLLECTIONS GROUP P A

701 S Howard Ave Ste 106-391

Tampa, FL 33606

Defendant Attorney

ROBINSON , ROSEMARY BARDI

Attorney at DUTTON LAW GROUP

4921 Memorial Hwy Ste 110

Tampa, FL 33634

 

Court Documents

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

06/24/2021: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

05/11/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

04/21/2021: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

04/16/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

04/16/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/24/2021
  • JudgementJudgment Code: NOVD; Judgment Description: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Instrument Number: 2021323139; Judge: Bagge-Hernandez, Michael C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2021
  • DocketMOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; Comment: (PARTIAL); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Hironaka, Cherlyn; Plaintiff: MRI ASSOCIATES OF ST. PETE; Plaintiff Doing Business As: SAINT PETE MRI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2021
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Additional Info: Defendant: Garrison Property And Casualty Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketAMENDED STATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: MRI ASSOCIATES OF ST. PETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: Garrison Property And Casualty Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: MRI ASSOCIATES OF ST. PETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: MRI ASSOCIATES OF ST. PETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: MRI ASSOCIATES OF ST. PETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: MRI ASSOCIATES OF ST. PETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: MRI ASSOCIATES OF ST. PETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: MRI ASSOCIATES OF ST. PETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: MRI ASSOCIATES OF ST. PETE

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MRI ASSOCIATES OF ST PETE INC AS ASSIGNEE OF- FOR JAVITZ, RUSSELL is a litigant

Latest cases where Garrison Property and Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DIVALE , LORCA