This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 12/01/2020 at 20:22:07 (UTC).

MRI ASSOCIATES OF ST. PETE vsProgressive Select Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 01/10/2019 MRI ASSOCIATES OF ST PETE vsProgressive Select Insurance Company was filed as an Other - Declaratory Judgment lawsuit. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Smith, E. Jared and Costello, Jessica. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2589

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Declaratory Judgment

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Smith, E. Jared

Costello, Jessica

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MRI ASSOCIATES OF ST. PETE

701 S. Howard Suite 106-391

Tampa, FL 33606

SAINT PETE MRI

GALLANT, WHITNEY

Defendant

Progressive Select Insurance Company

Florida Cfo As Ra Service Of Process Section P.O. Box 6200

Tallahassee, FL 32314

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DIVALE , LORCA

Attorney at THE PHYSICIAN COLLECTIONS GROUP P A

701 S Howard Ave Ste 106-391

Tampa, FL 33606

Defendant Attorney

BRINGUIER , MICHAEL ERNESTO

600 N West Shore Blvd Ste 300

Tampa, FL 33609

 

Court Documents

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

04/30/2020: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

MOTION FOR DEFAULT

04/08/2019: MOTION FOR DEFAULT

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

01/30/2019: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE

01/30/2019: NOTICE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

01/24/2019: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

01/18/2019: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

01/10/2019: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

01/10/2019: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

01/10/2019: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

01/10/2019: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

01/10/2019: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

01/10/2019: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

01/10/2019: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/30/2020
  • JudgementJudgment Code: VDIS; Judgment Description: VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Instrument Number: 2020182051; Judge: Costello, Jessica

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • DocketVOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF NON-AVAILABILITY; Additional Info: Plaintiff: GALLANT, WHITNEY; Plaintiff: MRI ASSOCIATES OF ST. PETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • DocketMOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER; Comment: OBJECTIONS AND/OR MOTION TO STRIKE; Additional Info: Defendant: Progressive Select Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Comment: ATTACHED - SIGNED ORDER IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT S MOTION/NOTICE OF CONFESSION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: MRI ASSOCIATES OF ST. PETE; Plaintiff Doing Business As: SAINT PETE MRI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • DocketMOTION TO DISMISS; Comment: , MOTION TO ENFORCE CONFESSION OF JUDGMENT, AND MOTION FOR ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT; Additional Info: Defendant: Progressive Select Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT; Comment: BY COURT AGAINST DEFENDANT, AND NOTICE OF APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF A DEFAULT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: GALLANT, WHITNEY; Plaintiff: MRI ASSOCIATES OF ST. PETE; Plaintiff Doing Business As: SAINT PETE MRI

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 01/24/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS; Comment: BY THE CHIEF FINANCIAL OFFICER OF THE STATE OF FLORIDA, ELECTRONIC DELIVERY TO PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY, 1/24/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: Progressive Select Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Comment: ((( NEEDS ADDITIONAL $25.00 FILING FEES ))); Additional Info: Plaintiff: MRI ASSOCIATES OF ST. PETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: MRI ASSOCIATES OF ST. PETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: MRI ASSOCIATES OF ST. PETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: MRI ASSOCIATES OF ST. PETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: MRI ASSOCIATES OF ST. PETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: MRI ASSOCIATES OF ST. PETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: MRI ASSOCIATES OF ST. PETE

    Read MoreRead Less