This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 03/14/2023 at 23:20:36 (UTC).

MRI Associates Of Spring Hill, Inc,Gray, Eugene, Jr vs Northland Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 10/11/2022 MRI Associates Of Spring Hill, Inc,Gray, Eugene, Jr filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Northland Insurance Company. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Schultz-Kin, Leslie. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2607

  • Filing Date:

    10/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Schultz-Kin, Leslie

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Gray, Eugene, Jr

MRI Associates Of Spring Hill, Inc

6946 West Linebaugh Ave

Tampa, FL 33626

SPRING HILL MRI

Defendant

Northland Insurance Company

Florida Department Of Insurance 200 East Gaines Street

Tallahassee, FL 32399-0300

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ORRICK , JOHN V, Jr

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF JOHN V. ORRICK, P.L.

6946 W Linebaugh Ave

Tampa, FL 33625

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

10/11/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

10/11/2022: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

10/11/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

General Differentiated Case Management Order

10/12/2022: General Differentiated Case Management Order

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

10/12/2022: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

10/26/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

11/16/2022: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/16/2022
  • JudgementJudgment Code: NOVD; Judgment Description: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Instrument Number: 2022547554; Judge: Schultz-Kin, Leslie

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Additional Info: Plaintiff: MRI Associates Of Spring Hill, Inc;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: Northland Insurance Company;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: MRI Associates Of Spring Hill, Inc;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: MRI Associates Of Spring Hill, Inc;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: MRI Associates Of Spring Hill, Inc;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: MRI Associates Of Spring Hill, Inc;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less