This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 10/17/2021 at 07:55:27 (UTC).

MRI ASSOCIATES OF LAKELAND LLC,Carthon, Ashley vs INFINITY AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 09/16/2021 MRI ASSOCIATES OF LAKELAND LLC,Carthon, Ashley filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against INFINITY AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Bagge-Hernandez, Michael. C and Bagge-Hernandez, C. Michael. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6605

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Bagge-Hernandez, Michael. C

Bagge-Hernandez, C. Michael

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MRI ASSOCIATES OF LAKELAND LLC, as assignee of Ash

2700 W. Dr. Mlk Jr. Blvd. Suite 400

Tampa, FL 33607

Carthon, Ashley

MRI ASSOCIATES OF LAKELAND LLC

2700 W. Dr. Mlk Jr. Blvd. Suite 400

Tampa, FL 33607

Defendants

INFINITY AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY, a foreign corpora

200 E. Gaines St.

Tallahassee, FL 32399

INFINITY AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY

200 E. Gaines St.

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FRIEDMAN , PHILIP ALAN

Attorney at FL LEGAL GROUP

Friedman Law Associates, P.L. 2700 W Dr Martin Luther King Jr Blvd

Tampa, FL 33607

Defendant Attorney

SULLIVAN , ANDRENETTE

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF GABRIEL O. FUNDORA & ASSO

506 W Fletcher Ave Ste 101

Tampa, FL 33612

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

09/30/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

General Differentiated Case Management Order

09/21/2021: General Differentiated Case Management Order

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

09/21/2021: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/16/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

09/16/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

09/16/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketMOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME; Additional Info: Defendant: INFINITY AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY; Private Attorney: SULLIVAN , ANDRENETTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Comment: AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; Additional Info: Defendant: INFINITY AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: INFINITY AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: MRI ASSOCIATES OF LAKELAND LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: MRI ASSOCIATES OF LAKELAND LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: MRI ASSOCIATES OF LAKELAND LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: MRI ASSOCIATES OF LAKELAND LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: MRI ASSOCIATES OF LAKELAND LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: MRI ASSOCIATES OF LAKELAND LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: MRI ASSOCIATES OF LAKELAND LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MRI ASSOCIATES OF ST PETE INC AS ASSIGNEE OF- FOR JAVITZ, RUSSELL is a litigant

Latest cases where Infinity Auto Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SULLIVAN ANDRENETTE