This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 07/09/2022 at 15:44:40 (UTC).

Mri Associates Of Brandon Llc,DAVIS, NADINE vs Peak Property And Casualty Insurance Corporation

Case Summary

On 05/13/2022 Mri Associates Of Brandon Llc,DAVIS, NADINE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Peak Property And Casualty Insurance Corporation. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Criminal Court Annex located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Allen, Lisa. A and Allen, A. Lisa. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1548

  • Filing Date:

    05/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Allen, A. Lisa

Allen, Lisa. A

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Mri Associates Of Brandon Llc D/B/A Brandon Mri A/A/O Nadine Davis

1430 20Th Avenue North

St Petersburg, FL 33704

BRANDON MRI

DAVIS, NADINE

Mri Associates Of Brandon Llc

1430 20Th Avenue North

St Petersburg, FL 33704

Defendant

Peak Property And Casualty Insurance Corporation

200 East Gaines St.

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BERNSTEIN , DEREK WILLIAM

Attorney at BERNSTEIN LAW

1430 20Th Ave N

St Petersburg, FL 33704

Defendant Attorney

MOGG , DANIELLA

Attorney at SENTRY INSURANCE COMPANY

Po Box 8051

Stevens Point, WI 54481

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

05/13/2022: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

05/13/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

05/13/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

05/13/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

05/13/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

05/13/2022: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

05/16/2022: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

General Differentiated Case Management Order

05/16/2022: General Differentiated Case Management Order

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

06/02/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

06/13/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

06/13/2022: DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

MOTION FOR DEFAULT

06/24/2022: MOTION FOR DEFAULT

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

06/27/2022: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Comment: AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; Additional Info: Defendant: Peak Property And Casualty Insurance Corporation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT; Comment: BY THE COURT AGAINST PEAK PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE CORPORATION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Mri Associates Of Brandon Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: Peak Property And Casualty Insurance Corporation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: Peak Property And Casualty Insurance Corporation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Mri Associates Of Brandon Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Mri Associates Of Brandon Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Mri Associates Of Brandon Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Mri Associates Of Brandon Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Mri Associates Of Brandon Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Mri Associates Of Brandon Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Mri Associates Of Brandon Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MRI ASSOCIATES OF ST PETE INC AS ASSIGNEE OF- FOR JAVITZ, RUSSELL is a litigant

Latest cases where Peak Property and Casualty Insurance Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DEREK W BERNSTEIN, ESQ