Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 06/08/2021 at 12:18:18 (UTC).

Mri Associates Of Bradenton Llc,Reynoso, Erick vs Infinity Auto Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 04/16/2021 Mri Associates Of Bradenton Llc,Reynoso, Erick filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Infinity Auto Insurance Company. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Moody, James. S and Moody, S. James. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6922

  • Filing Date:

    04/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Moody, James. S

Moody, S. James

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Mri Associates Of Bradenton Llc D/B/A Bradenton Mri A/A/O Erick Reynoso

1430 20Th Avenue North

St Petersburg, FL 33704

Mri Associates Of Bradenton Llc

1430 20Th Avenue North

St Petersburg, FL 33704

Bradenton MRI

Reynoso, Erick

Defendant

Infinity Auto Insurance Company

200 E.Gaines St.

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BERNSTEIN , DEREK WILLIAM

Attorney at BERNSTEIN LAW

1430 20Th Ave N

St Petersburg, FL 33704

Defendant Attorney

LATHAN , KEEGAN C.

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF GABRIEL O. FUNDORA & ASSOC

506 W Fletcher Ave Ste 101

Tampa, FL 33612

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

05/11/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

04/20/2021: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

04/16/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

04/16/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Comment: AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; Additional Info: Defendant: Infinity Auto Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: Infinity Auto Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Mri Associates Of Bradenton Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Mri Associates Of Bradenton Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Mri Associates Of Bradenton Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Mri Associates Of Bradenton Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Mri Associates Of Bradenton Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Mri Associates Of Bradenton Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Mri Associates Of Bradenton Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MRI ASSOCIATES OF ST PETE INC AS ASSIGNEE OF- FOR JAVITZ, RUSSELL is a litigant

Latest cases where Infinity Auto Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DEREK W BERNSTEIN, ESQ