This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 12/26/2019 at 15:54:49 (UTC).

MORTGAGE RESEARCH CENTER LLC vs GOBERT, LISA

Case Summary

On 01/31/2019 MORTGAGE RESEARCH CENTER LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against GOBERT, LISA. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Rice, G. Elizabeth. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1142

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Rice, G. Elizabeth

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MORTGAGE RESEARCH CENTER LLC

225 Robinson Street Suite 660

Orlando, FL 32812

Defendants

Unknown Tenant in Possession 2

Tampa, FL 33647

Lyle, Whitney Diane

Tampa, FL 33647

LIVE OAK PRESERVE ASSOCIATION INC

101 E. Kennedy Blvd Suite 2800

Tampa, FL 33602

Unknown Tenant in Possession 1

GOBERT, LISA

Tampa, FL 33647

Santana, Tanya J

Tampa, FL 33647

Santana, James G

Tampa, FL 33647

Aqua Finance Inc

1201 Hays Street

Tallahassee, FL 32301

Unknown Spouse of Lisa Gobert

Tampa, FL 33647

LIVE OAK DEVELOPMENT 1 LLC

1951 Nw 19Th Street Suite 200

Boca Raton, FL 33431

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

COLLINS , SARA, Esquire

Attorney at MCCALLA RAYMER LEIBERT PIERCE LLC

225 E Robinson St Ste 155

Orlando, FL 32801

COLLINS , SARA BETH

Attorney at MCCALLA RAYMER LEIBERT PIERCE LLC

225 E Robinson St Ste 155

Orlando, FL 32801

Defendant Attorneys

MULLIS , BRANDON K, Esquire

Attorney at MANKIN LAW GROUP

2535 Landmark Dr Ste 212

Clearwater, FL 33761-3930

MULLIS , BRANDON K

Attorney at MANKIN LAW GROUP

2535 Landmark Dr Ste 212

Clearwater, FL 33761-3930

 

Court Documents

DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

05/01/2019: DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

04/25/2019: MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED

04/03/2019: SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

04/02/2019: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

LIS PENDENS

01/31/2019: LIS PENDENS

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

01/31/2019: DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO RULE 2-420

01/31/2019: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO RULE 2-420

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

01/31/2019: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

01/31/2019: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

04/02/2019: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

01/31/2019: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

01/31/2019: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

01/31/2019: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

01/31/2019: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

01/31/2019: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

01/31/2019: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

01/31/2019: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

LIS PENDENS (RECORDABLE)

01/31/2019: LIS PENDENS (RECORDABLE)

33 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/27/2019
  • DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • DocketJUDGE'S COPIES OF PLEADINGS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • DocketORIGINAL DOCUMENTS RETURNED PER ORDER; Comment: RETURNED ORIGINAL NOTE & MORTGAGE TO- MCCALLA RAYMER LEIBERT PIERCE, LLC., 225 E. ROBINSON ST., STE. 155, ORLANDO, FL 32801 (ORDER) SIGNED PER ORDER 08/26/19 BY EGR; Additional Info: Plaintiff: MORTGAGE RESEARCH CENTER LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • DocketORIGINAL DOCUMENTS RETURNED PER ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • DocketMOTION FOR RETURN OF ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS; Comment: DISMISS ACTION, AND RELEASE THE LIS PENDENS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: MORTGAGE RESEARCH CENTER LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLING HEARING; Comment: PLTFF'S- MOTION FOR SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND TAXATION OF ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS AND REFORMATION OF DEEDS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: MORTGAGE RESEARCH CENTER LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TELEPHONIC HEARING; Comment: MOTION FOR SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE ANS TAXATION OF ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS AND REFORMATION OF DEEDS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: MORTGAGE RESEARCH CENTER LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE WITH FORECLOSURE PROCEDURES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: MORTGAGE RESEARCH CENTER LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK; Additional Info: Defendant: Aqua Finance Inc; Defendant: GOBERT, LISA; Defendant: LIVE OAK DEVELOPMENT 1 LLC; Defendant: Lyle, Whitney Diane; Defendant: Santana, James G; Defendant: Santana, Tanya J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Comment: ATTACHED: ORIGINAL NOTE AND MORTGAGE (MAILED TO CLERK FROM PLNTFF 4/29/19); Additional Info: Plaintiff: MORTGAGE RESEARCH CENTER LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
41 More Docket Entries
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: x 9 MRService@mccallaraymer.com ; e-portalconfirmations@mccalla.com ; sara.collins@mccalla.com

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: x 9 MRService@mccallaraymer.com ; e-portalconfirmations@mccalla.com ; sara.collins@mccalla.com

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: x 9 MRService@mccallaraymer.com ; e-portalconfirmations@mccalla.com ; sara.collins@mccalla.com

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: x 9 MRService@mccallaraymer.com ; e-portalconfirmations@mccalla.com ; sara.collins@mccalla.com

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: x 9 MRService@mccallaraymer.com ; e-portalconfirmations@mccalla.com ; sara.collins@mccalla.com

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: x 9 MRService@mccallaraymer.com ; e-portalconfirmations@mccalla.com ; sara.collins@mccalla.com

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: x 9 MRService@mccallaraymer.com ; e-portalconfirmations@mccalla.com ; sara.collins@mccalla.com

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS (RECORDABLE); Additional Info: Defendant: Aqua Finance Inc; Defendant: GOBERT, LISA; Defendant: LIVE OAK DEVELOPMENT 1 LLC; Defendant: LIVE OAK PRESERVE ASSOCIATION INC; Defendant: Lyle, Whitney Diane; Defendant: Santana, James G; Defendant: Santana, Tanya J; Defendant: Unknown Spouse of Lisa Gobert; Defendant: Unknown Tenant in Possession 1; Defendant: Unknown Tenant in Possession 2; Plaintiff: MORTGAGE RESEARCH CENTER LLC; Vol./Book: 26383, Page: 1461, Number of Pages: 1461

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • JudgementJudgment Code: ODISM; Judgment Description: ORDER OF DISMISSAL; Instrument Number: 2019374328; Judge: Rice, Elizabeth G

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • JudgementJudgment Code: NDUNP; Judgment Description: NOTICE OF DROPPING UNNAMED PARTY; Judge: Rice, Elizabeth G

    Read MoreRead Less