Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 04/15/2021 at 02:55:27 (UTC).

MORGAN, HAIDEE ANN - Estate

Case Summary

On 02/19/2020 MORGAN, HAIDEE ANN - Estate was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Corvo, T. Vivian and Corvo, Vivian. T. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0562

  • Filing Date:

    02/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Corvo, T. Vivian

Corvo, Vivian. T

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court and Petitioners

MORGAN, ERNEST P

Irving, TX 75230

LAURENT, YOLANDA

Slidell, LA 70458

SMITH, EVA

Carrollton, TX 75007

GALMAN, GRETCHEN

Jacksonville, FL 32218

NEW TESTAMENT WORSHIP CENTER

5107 East 32Nd Avenue

Tampa, FL 33619

FACIANE, SANDRA

Frisco, TX 75035

GEORGE, DILLIS

Irving, TX 75063

MORGAN, GRETEL

Frisco, TX 75035

Claimant

UNIVERSITY MEDICAL SERVICE ASSOCIATION, INC.

12901 Bruce B. Downs Blvd

Tampa, FL 33612

Decedent

MORGAN, HAIDEE ANN

Brandon, FL 33510

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court and Petitioner Attorney

WRIGHT-DOUGLAS , KAYDELL

Attorney at KAYDELL WRIGHT-DOUGLAS,ESQ.P.A.

110 N Armenia Ave Ste A

Tampa, FL 33609-2377

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketOBJECTION TO CLAIM OF; Comment: UNIVERSITY MEDICAL SERVICE ASSOCIATION, INC DBA USF HEALTH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • DocketREC OF BENE & CONSENT TO DISCH; Comment: NEW TESTAMENT WORSHIP CENTER; Additional Info: Beneficiary: NEW TESTAMENT WORSHIP CENTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketINVENTORY OF PERSONAL REP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Comment: $825.53, KWRIGHTDOUGLAS@VERIZON.NET 08/11/20; Additional Info: Claimant: UNIVERSITY MEDICAL SERVICE ASSOCIATION, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • DocketPROOF OF PUB OF NOTICE CREDITORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • DocketCOPY OF; Comment: NOTICE TO CREDITORS WITHOUT PUBLICATION DATE-FILER HAS BEEN NOTIFIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED VIA ACH - eCERTIFY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketORDER ADMITTING WILL-APPT PR; Comment: BOND WAIVED; Additional Info: Beneficiary: MORGAN, ERNEST P; Personal Representative: MORGAN, ERNEST P; Petitioner: MORGAN, ERNEST P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketLETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION; Additional Info: Beneficiary: MORGAN, ERNEST P; Personal Representative: MORGAN, ERNEST P; Petitioner: MORGAN, ERNEST P; Date 2: 06/19/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketLAST WILL AND TESTAMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketFORMAL NOTICE; Comment: GRETCHEN GALMAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketFORMAL NOTICE; Comment: YOLANDA LAURENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketFORMAL NOTICE; Comment: EVA SMITH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketFORMAL NOTICE; Comment: GRETEL MORGAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketFORMAL NOTICE; Comment: DILLIS GEORGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketFORMAL NOTICE; Comment: SANDRA FACIANE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketFORMAL NOTICE; Comment: NEW TESTAMENT WORSHIP CENTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketPROBATE NEW CASE FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketPET FOR ADMIN-FLA RES W-WILL; Additional Info: Beneficiary: MORGAN, ERNEST P; Personal Representative: MORGAN, ERNEST P; Petitioner: MORGAN, ERNEST P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF HEIRS; Additional Info: Beneficiary: MORGAN, ERNEST P; Personal Representative: MORGAN, ERNEST P; Petitioner: MORGAN, ERNEST P

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UNIVERSITY MEDICAL SERVICE ASSOCIATION, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WRIGHT-DOUGLAS , KAYDELL