This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 08/23/2022 at 19:05:53 (UTC).

Moore, Marquis vs Stout, David Lee

Case Summary

On 12/08/2021 Moore, Marquis filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Stout, David Lee. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Hinson, C.. Carl, Polo, Melissa M., Polo, Melissa. M. and Polo, M.. Melissa. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9717

  • Filing Date:

    12/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Hinson, C.. Carl

Polo, Melissa M.

Polo, Melissa. M.

Polo, M.. Melissa

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Moore, Marquis

Tampa, FL 33602

Defendants

Stout, David Lee

Lakeland, FL 33810

U.S. Security Associates, Inc.

1200 South Pine Island Road

Plantation, FL 33324

Universal Protection Service, LLC

1200 South Pine Island Road

Plantation, FL 33324

Universal Protection Service, LLC and Allied Universal Security Services, jointly

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CULPEPPER , BRAD

Attorney at CULPEPPER KURLAND, PLLC

101 E Kennedy Blvd Ste 2300

Tampa, FL 33602

Defendant Attorney

ARLINE , KATHY

Attorney at WILSON ELSER MOSKOWITZ EDELMAN & DICKER

111 N Orange Ave Ste 1200

Orlando, FL 32801

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

12/08/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

12/08/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

12/08/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

12/08/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

COMPLAINT

12/08/2021: COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/08/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL AND JURY TRIAL

07/29/2022: ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL AND JURY TRIAL

NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO DEPOSITION

07/07/2022: NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO DEPOSITION

NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO DEPOSITION

07/07/2022: NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO DEPOSITION

NOTICE OF NON-AVAILABILITY

06/29/2022: NOTICE OF NON-AVAILABILITY

NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO DEPOSITION

06/24/2022: NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO DEPOSITION

AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO DEPOSITION

06/24/2022: AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO DEPOSITION

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

06/17/2022: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

05/23/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY NO SUBPOENA ATTACHED

05/10/2022: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY NO SUBPOENA ATTACHED

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

04/27/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

04/27/2022: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

04/25/2022: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

44 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER SETTING PRETRIAL AND JURY TRIAL; Additional Info: Defendant: Stout, David Lee; Defendant: U.S. Security Associates, Inc.; Defendant: Universal Protection Service, LLC; Defendant: Universal Protection Service, LLC and Allied Universal Security Services, jointly; Plaintiff: Moore, Marquis; Private Attorney: ARLINE , KATHY; Private Attorney: CULPEPPER , BRAD; Date Signed: 07/29/2022; Judicial Officer: Polo, Melissa M.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • HearingDifferentiated Case Management; Hearing Time: 09:30 AM; Hearing Location: ZOOM HTTPS://ZOOM.US/J/8901592416 MEETING NUMBER: 890-159-2416IF JOINING BY PHONE, DIAL 1-786-635-1003 Judicial Officer: Polo, Melissa M.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO DEPOSITION; Additional Info: Defendant: Stout, David Lee; Defendant: Universal Protection Service, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO DEPOSITION; Additional Info: Defendant: Stout, David Lee; Defendant: Universal Protection Service, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF NON-AVAILABILITY; Additional Info: Defendant: Stout, David Lee; Defendant: Universal Protection Service, LLC and Allied Universal Security Services, jointly

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO DEPOSITION; Additional Info: Defendant: Stout, David Lee; Defendant: Universal Protection Service, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO DEPOSITION; Comment: DEPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF; Additional Info: Defendant: Stout, David Lee; Defendant: Universal Protection Service, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Moore, Marquis

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketREQUEST FOR COPIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Moore, Marquis

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Moore, Marquis

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
41 More Docket Entries
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Moore, Marquis

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Moore, Marquis

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Moore, Marquis

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Moore, Marquis

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Moore, Marquis

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Moore, Marquis

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Moore, Marquis

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Moore, Marquis

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Moore, Marquis

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Moore, Marquis

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U.S. SECURITY ASSOCIATES INC is a litigant

Latest cases where UNIVERSAL PROTECTION SERVICE LP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ARLINE, KATHY