This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 12/29/2022 at 00:09:03 (UTC).

Montgomery, Joseph Aaron vs Montgomery, Jennifer Veronica

Case Summary

On 05/06/2022 Montgomery, Joseph Aaron filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Montgomery, Jennifer Veronica. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Tibbals, Wesley. D, Tibbals, D. Wesley and Tibbals, D.. Wesley. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6121

  • Filing Date:

    05/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Tibbals, Wesley. D

Tibbals, D. Wesley

Tibbals, D.. Wesley

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Montgomery, Joseph Aaron

Zephyrhillis, FL 33501

Respondent

Montgomery, Jennifer Veronica

Riverview, FL 33579

Guardian Ad Litem

SCULLY, KRISTEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

BRUNET , JAMES PRESTON

Attorney at THE BRUNET LAW FIRM, LLC

6271 Saint Augustine Rd # 24-257

Jacksonville, FL 32217

Respondent Attorney

OLIVERO , SHIOBHAN

Attorney at OLIVERO LAW, P.A.

1463 Oakfield Dr Ste 129

Brandon, FL 33511

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/28/2022
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Respondent: Montgomery, Jennifer Veronica;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Respondent: Montgomery, Jennifer Veronica;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketACCEPTANCE; Comment: OF APPOINTMENT AS GUARDIAN AD LITEM AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Guardian Ad Litem: SCULLY, KRISTEN;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • DocketORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM; Additional Info: Date Signed: 10/13/2022; Judicial Officer:: Tibbals, Wesley D;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • DocketMOTION TO APPOINT GUARDIAN AD LITEM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • DocketPREJUDGMENT AGREEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2022
  • DocketFINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT; Additional Info: Petitioner: Montgomery, Joseph Aaron;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF COMPLIANCE; Additional Info: Petitioner: Montgomery, Joseph Aaron;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • DocketORDER OF REFERRAL TO FAMILY MEDIATION; Comment: ORDER REFERRING PARTIES TO FAMILY MEDIATION; Additional Info: Date Signed: 08/15/2022; Judicial Officer:: Tibbals, Wesley D.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketSRS NEW CASE FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Petitioner: Montgomery, Joseph Aaron;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Petitioner: Montgomery, Joseph Aaron;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketPETITION FILED; Additional Info: Petitioner: Montgomery, Joseph Aaron;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASE; Additional Info: Petitioner: Montgomery, Joseph Aaron;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER; Additional Info: Petitioner: Montgomery, Joseph Aaron;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketSummons (Initial Case Filing); Additional Info: Petitioner: Montgomery, Joseph Aaron;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO RULE 2-420; Additional Info: Petitioner: Montgomery, Joseph Aaron;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketUNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY AND JURISDICTION ACT; Additional Info: Petitioner: Montgomery, Joseph Aaron;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketDH513 FORM; Additional Info: Petitioner: Montgomery, Joseph Aaron;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less