This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 02/25/2019 at 23:39:52 (UTC).

MOFFATT, RAYMOND vs A O SMITH WATER PRODUCTS COMPANY

Case Summary

On 05/10/2017 MOFFATT, RAYMOND filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against A O SMITH WATER PRODUCTS COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Ficarrotta, N. Ronald. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4371

  • Filing Date:

    05/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Ficarrotta, N. Ronald

 

Party Details

Defendants

SIEMENS INDUSTRY INC

1200 South Pine Island Road

Plantation, FL 33324

Butler Manufacturing

120 South Central Ave

Clayton, MO 63105

SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC USA INC

1201 Hays Street

Tallahassee, FL 32301

Bluescope Construction/Butler Heavy Structures

1200 South Pine Island Road

Plantation, FL 33324

FOSTER WHEELER LLC

1209 Orange St.

Wilmington, DE 19801

KENNEDY VALVE MFG CO INC

1021 East Water Street

Elmira, NY 14901

GRINNELL LLC

1200 South Pine Island Road

Plantation, FL 33324

FLOWSERVE US INC

1209 Orange St.

Wilmington, DE 19801

GLAXOSMITHKLINE LLC

1201 Hays Street

Tallahassee, FL 32301

Ingersoll-Rand Company

1201 Hays Street

Tallahassee, FL 32301

DURO DYNE CORPORATION

81 Spence St.

Bayshore, NY 11706

Warren Pumps LLC

1209 Orange Street

Wilmington, DE 19801

CABLE & WIRELESS COMMUNICATIONS INC

11380 Prosperity Farms Road #221E

Palm Beach Gardens, FL 33410

UNILEVER UNITES STATES, INC.

1200 South Pine Island Road

Plantation, FL 33324

KOHLER CO

1200 South Pine Island Road

Plantation, FL 33324

RILEY STOKER CORPORATION

1200 South Pine Island Road

Plantation, FL 33324

RHEEM MANUFACTURING COMPANY

1209 Orange Street

Wilmington, DE 19801

IMO INDUSTRIES INC

155 Federal Street Ste. 700

Boston, MA 02110

ABB INC

1200 South Pine Island Road

Plantation, FL 33324

General Electric Company

1200 South Pine Island Road

Plantation, FL 33324

34 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

COLLINGS , CHRISTOPHER JAMES MORE

Attorney at SAUL EWING ARNSTEIN & LEHR LLP

200 S Biscayne Blvd Ste 3600

Miami, FL 33131

MCCUTCHEON , CAITLYN R.

Attorney at MORGAN, LEWIS & BOCKIUS, LLP

200 S Biscayne Blvd Ste 5300

Miami, FL 33131

SPURR , DALE JAY

Attorney at LUKS, SANTANIELLO, PETRILLO & JONES, LLC

150 W Flagler St Ste 2600

Miami, FL 33130

BLEVINS, F BRYANT

Attorney at BUTLER WEIHMULLER KATZ CRAIG LLP

80 Sw 8Th St Ste 3300

Miami, FL 33130

ZASLOW , ANDREW JAY

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF TIMOTHY CLARK, PA

915 Middle River Dr Ste 209

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33304

CHUNG-TIMS , MELANIE ERICA

Attorney at BICE COLE LAW FIRM

999 Ponce De Leon Blvd Ste 710

Coral Gables, FL 33134

Other Attorneys

UPSHAW , ANTHONY NOLAN

Attorney at MCDERMOTT WILL & EMERY LLP

333 Se 2Nd Ave Ste 4500

Miami, FL 33131

REYNOLDS , CHARLES EDWARD, II

1217 S Roxmere Rd

Tampa, FL 33629

NUZUM , JANNA MARIE

Attorney at MCGIVNEY, KLUGER AND COOK, P.C.

4901 Nw 17Th Way Ste 202

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33309

WEINSTEIN , STUART AARON

7777 Glades Rd Ste 400

Boca Raton, FL 33434

ALLEY , TODD CARLTON

Attorney at HAWKINS PARNELL THACKSTON & YOUNG, LLP

303 Peachtree St Ne

Atlanta, GA 30308

REITER, JACK ROY

Attorney at GRAY ROBINSON, P.A.

333 Se 2Nd Ave Ste 3200

Miami, FL 33131

BLACK , CHANDLER

Attorney at CONROY, SIMBERG, GANON, KREVANS, ABEL,

3440 Hollywood Blvd Ste 200

Hollywood, FL 33021

VINSON , BEN ANDREW, Jr

Attorney at VINSON LAW PA

505 E Jackson St Ste 305

Tampa, FL 33602

SHUKLA , KUSH

Attorney at MEIROWITZ & WASSERBERG. LLP

233 Broadway Rm 950

New York, NY 10279

CLARK , TIMOTHY

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF TIMOTHY CLARK, P.A.

915 Middle River Dr Ste 209

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33304

IOVINO , CAROLINE MARIE

Attorney at MCDERMOTT WILL & EMEREY LLP

333 Se 2Nd Ave Ste 4500

Miami, FL 33131

SMITH , MELVILLE STEPHEN, III

80 Sw 8Th St Ste 3000

Miami, FL 33130

ALONZO , MARK A.

Attorney at VINSON LAW, P.A.

505 E Jackson St Ste 305

Tampa, FL 33602

METZLER , DEBRA M

201 E Kennedy Blvd Ste 1700

Tampa, FL 33602

6 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

NOTICE

01/22/2018: NOTICE

AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING

11/09/2017: AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF JOINDER

11/09/2017: NOTICE OF JOINDER

NOTICE OF JOINDER

11/07/2017: NOTICE OF JOINDER

NOTICE OF JOINDER

11/07/2017: NOTICE OF JOINDER

NOTICE OF JOINDER

11/07/2017: NOTICE OF JOINDER

NOTICE OF JOINDER

11/07/2017: NOTICE OF JOINDER

ORDER ON - TO - FOR

11/29/2017: ORDER ON - TO - FOR

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

07/19/2018: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

07/11/2017: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

07/07/2017: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

07/05/2017: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

06/28/2017: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

06/28/2017: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

06/28/2017: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

06/28/2017: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

06/13/2017: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

06/06/2017: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

324 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Comment: WITH PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANT, HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC, ONLY; Additional Info: Plaintiff: MOFFATT, RAYMOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE; Comment: OF NEW RELATED MATTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON - TO - FOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF JOINDER; Comment: DFDTS - IN CO- DEFENDANT S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF S AMENDED MOTION TO ENLARGE TIME TO SUBSTITUTE DECEASED PARTY OR ALTERNATIVELY FOR SUBSTITUTION...

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF JOINDER; Comment: AND ADOPTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF JOINDER; Comment: AND ADOPTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF JOINDER; Comment: DEFT, ABB, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF JOINDER

    Read MoreRead Less
336 More Docket Entries
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Judgment Code: NOVD; Judgment Description: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Instrument Number: 2017276558

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Judgment Code: NOVD; Judgment Description: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Instrument Number: 2017276557

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Judgment Code: NOVD; Judgment Description: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Instrument Number: 2017269667

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Judgment Code: NOVD; Judgment Description: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Instrument Number: 2017268076

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Judgment Code: NOVD; Judgment Description: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Instrument Number: 2017259654

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Judgment Code: NOVD; Judgment Description: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Instrument Number: 2017259638

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Judgment Code: NOVD; Judgment Description: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Instrument Number: 2017259616

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Judgment Code: NOVD; Judgment Description: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Instrument Number: 2017259492

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Judgment Code: NOVD; Judgment Description: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Instrument Number: 2017234053

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Judgment Code: NOVD; Judgment Description: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Instrument Number: 2017223904

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Butler Manufacturing, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where UNILEVER UNITED STATES, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where KOHLER CO. A WISCONSIN CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where RHEEM MANUFACTURING COMPANY is a litigant