This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 12/25/2022 at 18:48:42 (UTC).

MOBILE AUTO GLASS REPAIR LLC vs STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 11/09/2022 MOBILE AUTO GLASS REPAIR LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Giardina, James. S and Giardina, S. James. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7323

  • Filing Date:

    11/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Giardina, James. S

Giardina, S. James

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MOBILE AUTO GLASS REPAIR LLC

2700 W. Dr. Mlk, Jr. Blvd. Suite 400

Tampa, FL 33607

SARMIENTO, HECTOR

Defendant

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

200 E. Gaines St

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FOX , KAITLIN ELIZABETH

Attorney at FL LEGAL GROUP

2700 W Dr Martin Luther King Jr Blvd Ste 400

Tampa, FL 33607

Defendant Attorney

PATRICH , MELANIE YAEL

Attorney at BANKER LOPEZ GASSLER P.A.

360 Central Ave Ste 700

St Petersburg, FL 33701

 

Court Documents

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

11/09/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

11/09/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

11/09/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

11/09/2022: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

11/09/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/09/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

11/14/2022: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

General Differentiated Case Management Order

11/14/2022: General Differentiated Case Management Order

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

12/04/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

12/06/2022: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

NOTICE

12/09/2022: NOTICE

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE; Additional Info: Defendant: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY; Private Attorney: PATRICH , MELANIE YAEL;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Additional Info: Defendant: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: MOBILE AUTO GLASS REPAIR LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: MOBILE AUTO GLASS REPAIR LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: MOBILE AUTO GLASS REPAIR LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: MOBILE AUTO GLASS REPAIR LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: MOBILE AUTO GLASS REPAIR LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: MOBILE AUTO GLASS REPAIR LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: MOBILE AUTO GLASS REPAIR LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less