This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 08/03/2022 at 12:24:40 (UTC).

MOBILE AUTO GLASS REPAIR LLC vs AMICA MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 07/01/2022 MOBILE AUTO GLASS REPAIR LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against AMICA MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Bagge-Hernandez, C. Michael and Bagge-Hernandez, Michael. C. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7331

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Bagge-Hernandez, C. Michael

Bagge-Hernandez, Michael. C

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MOBILE AUTO GLASS REPAIR LLC DBA MR AUTO GLASS AAO

640 Brooker Creek Blvd. Suite 420

Oldsmar, FL 34677

DALPIAN, DENNA

MOBILE AUTO GLASS REPAIR LLC

640 Brooker Creek Blvd. Suite 420

Oldsmar, FL 34677

MR. AUTO GLASS

Defendant

AMICA MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

P.O. Box 6008

Providence, RI 02940

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KANENBLEY , PETER EDWARD, Jr

Attorney at KANENBLEY CHAPLIN, LLC

4000 Hollywood Blvd Ste 555S

Hollywood, FL 33021

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

07/01/2022: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

07/01/2022: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

07/01/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

07/01/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

07/01/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

07/01/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

General Differentiated Case Management Order

07/05/2022: General Differentiated Case Management Order

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

07/05/2022: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

07/12/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

OBJECTION

07/18/2022: OBJECTION

MOTION TO INVOKE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

07/18/2022: MOTION TO INVOKE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

OBJECTION

07/18/2022: OBJECTION

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

07/18/2022: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Comment: AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; Additional Info: Defendant: AMICA MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOBJECTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO INVOKE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE; Additional Info: Defendant: AMICA MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOBJECTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: AMICA MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Defendant: AMICA MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Defendant: AMICA MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: AMICA MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Defendant: AMICA MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Defendant: AMICA MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Defendant: AMICA MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Additional Info: Defendant: AMICA MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MR. AUTO GLASS is a litigant

Latest cases where MOBILE AUTO GLASS REPAIR LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Amica Mutual Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kanenbley, Peter Edward Jr