This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 07/04/2022 at 05:43:09 (UTC).

MOBILE AUTO GLASS REPAIR LLC vs STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 05/13/2022 MOBILE AUTO GLASS REPAIR LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Bagge-Hernandez, C. Michael and Bagge-Hernandez, Michael. C. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1409

  • Filing Date:

    05/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Bagge-Hernandez, C. Michael

Bagge-Hernandez, Michael. C

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MOBILE AUTO GLASS REPAIR LLC, a/a/o Samuel Kenyon

2700 W Dr Martin Luther King Jr Blvd Ste 400

Tampa, FL 33607

Kenyon, Samuel

MOBILE AUTO GLASS REPAIR LLC

2700 W Dr Martin Luther King Jr Blvd Ste 400

Tampa, FL 33607

Defendants

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY, a

200 E. Gaines Street

Tallahassee, FL 32399

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

200 E. Gaines Street

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FOX , KAITLIN ELIZABETH

Attorney at FL LEGAL GROUP

2700 W Dr Martin Luther King Jr Blvd Ste 400

Tampa, FL 33607

Defendant Attorney

JOZWIAK , ERICA LOREN

Attorney at BANKER LOPEZ GASSLER P.A.

360 Central Ave Ste 700

St Petersburg, FL 33701

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF SERVICE

05/13/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

05/13/2022: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

05/13/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

05/13/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

05/13/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

05/13/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

05/16/2022: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

General Differentiated Case Management Order

05/16/2022: General Differentiated Case Management Order

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

06/08/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME

06/14/2022: MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

06/14/2022: DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

MOTION TO INVOKE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

06/14/2022: MOTION TO INVOKE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

06/14/2022: MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

06/23/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS; Comment: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY 05/23/2022; Additional Info: Plaintiff: MOBILE AUTO GLASS REPAIR LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Additional Info: Defendant: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO INVOKE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE; Additional Info: Defendant: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; Additional Info: Defendant: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME; Comment: TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; Additional Info: Defendant: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: MOBILE AUTO GLASS REPAIR LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: MOBILE AUTO GLASS REPAIR LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: MOBILE AUTO GLASS REPAIR LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: MOBILE AUTO GLASS REPAIR LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: MOBILE AUTO GLASS REPAIR LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: MOBILE AUTO GLASS REPAIR LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: MOBILE AUTO GLASS REPAIR LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MOBILE AUTO GLASS REPAIR LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JOZWIAK , ERICA LOREN