This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 11/28/2021 at 20:35:55 (UTC).

MOBILE AUTO GLASS REPAIR LLC vs STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 10/15/2021 MOBILE AUTO GLASS REPAIR LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Schultz-Kin, Leslie. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4922

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Schultz-Kin, Leslie

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MOBILE AUTO GLASS REPAIR LLC, a/a/o Charles Bouche

2700 W Dr Martin Luther King Jr Blvd Ste 400

Tampa, FL 33607

Boucher, Charles

MOBILE AUTO GLASS REPAIR LLC

2700 W Dr Martin Luther King Jr Blvd Ste 400

Tampa, FL 33607

Defendant

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

200 E Gaines St

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COLLINS , JAMES ROGER, Jr

Attorney at FL LEGAL GROUP

2700 W. Dr. Mlk, Jr. Blvd., Suite 400

Tampa, FL 33607

Defendant Attorney

ALLEN , BRIAN TAYLOR

Attorney at BANKER LOPEZ GASSLER P.A.

360 Central Ave Ste 700

St Petersburg, FL 33701

 

Court Documents

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

10/15/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

10/15/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

10/15/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

General Differentiated Case Management Order

10/19/2021: General Differentiated Case Management Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Comment: DEFENDANT S CONFESSION OF JUDGMENT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: MOBILE AUTO GLASS REPAIR LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketEXHIBIT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: MOBILE AUTO GLASS REPAIR LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketMOTION FOR AWARDING ATTORNEY FEES; Comment: AND COSTS PURSUANT TO FLORIDA SMALL CLAIMS RULE 7.175/FLORIDA RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 1.525; Additional Info: Plaintiff: MOBILE AUTO GLASS REPAIR LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketNOTICE; Comment: OF WILLINGNESS TO STIPULATE TO PLAINTIFF S ENTITLEMENT TO REASONABLE ATTORNEY S FEES AND TAXABLE COSTS; Additional Info: Defendant: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Comment: AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Defendant: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketDEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; Additional Info: Defendant: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketMOTION TO INVOKE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE; Additional Info: Defendant: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: MOBILE AUTO GLASS REPAIR LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: MOBILE AUTO GLASS REPAIR LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: MOBILE AUTO GLASS REPAIR LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: MOBILE AUTO GLASS REPAIR LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: MOBILE AUTO GLASS REPAIR LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: MOBILE AUTO GLASS REPAIR LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: MOBILE AUTO GLASS REPAIR LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MOBILE AUTO GLASS REPAIR LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer COLLINS , JAMES ROGER, Jr