This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 05/01/2022 at 04:00:40 (UTC).

MINNIE JACKSON - Estate

Case Summary

On 11/15/2021 MINNIE JACKSON - Estate was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Plant City Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Weis, A. Richard and Weis, Richard. A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4180

  • Filing Date:

    11/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Weis, A. Richard

Weis, Richard. A

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court and Petitioners

MACKEY, RODNEY K., Sr

Plant City, FL 33567

ABDULWASI, GERALD

Plant City, FL 33567

MACKEY MALLARD, ANDREA

Tampa, FL 33610

MACKEY, CHARLES V

MACKEY, CHERYL

Fort Washington, MD 20744

MACKEY, ELAINE BULLOCK

Edison, NJ 08820

MACKEY, GWENDOLYN

Jefferson, GA 30549

MACKEY, KENNETH L

Fort Washington, MD 20744

MACKEY, VERLIE M

MACKEY-DAVIS, KAMALA

Tampa, FL 33619

Claimant

BAYCARE HEALTH SYSTEM INC

2995 Drew St, 2Nd Fl, Auto/Legal Dept

Clearwater, FL 33759

Decedent

JACKSON, MINNIE M.

Plant City, FL 33567

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court and Petitioner Attorney

WILLIAMS , JOSEPH MAURICE

Attorney at WILLIAMS MOORE LAW FIRM

1409 Thonotosassa Rd

Plant City, FL 33563

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2022
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING PERS REP; Comment: NO BOND; Additional Info: Personal Representative: MACKEY, RODNEY K., Sr; Petitioner: MACKEY, RODNEY K., Sr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • DocketLETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION; Additional Info: Personal Representative: MACKEY, RODNEY K., Sr; Petitioner: MACKEY, RODNEY K., Sr; Date 2: 02/01/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • DocketAMENDED PETITION; Comment: SECOND, FOR ADMINISTRATION; Additional Info: Personal Representative: MACKEY, RODNEY K., Sr; Petitioner: MACKEY, RODNEY K., Sr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • DocketOATH, DESIGNATION & ACCEPTANCE; Comment: AMENDED; Additional Info: Personal Representative: MACKEY, RODNEY K., Sr; Petitioner: MACKEY, RODNEY K., Sr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Comment: SO FL BAPTIST HOSP - $741.94; Additional Info: Decedent: JACKSON, MINNIE M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Comment: SO FL BAPTIST HOSP - $741.94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketOATH, DESIGNATION & ACCEPTANCE; Additional Info: Personal Representative: MACKEY, RODNEY K., Sr; Petitioner: MACKEY, RODNEY K., Sr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketAMENDED PETITION; Comment: FOR FORMAL ADMINISTRATION; Additional Info: Personal Representative: MACKEY, RODNEY K., Sr; Petitioner: MACKEY, RODNEY K., Sr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketW-PRIOR,NOTICE CONSENT TO P R; Comment: ELAINE MACKEY; Additional Info: Personal Representative: MACKEY, RODNEY K., Sr; Petitioner: MACKEY, RODNEY K., Sr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE FILED; Additional Info: Personal Representative: MACKEY, RODNEY K., Sr; Petitioner: MACKEY, RODNEY K., Sr

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketPROOF OF PUB OF NOTICE CREDITORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketNOTICE TO CREDITORS; Comment: 1ST PUB: 11/26/21; Additional Info: Personal Representative: MACKEY, RODNEY K., Sr; Petitioner: MACKEY, RODNEY K., Sr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF HEIRS; Additional Info: Personal Representative: MACKEY, RODNEY K., Sr; Petitioner: MACKEY, RODNEY K., Sr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketPROBATE NEW CASE FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketPET FOR ADMIN-FLA RES W-O WILL; Additional Info: Personal Representative: MACKEY, RODNEY K., Sr; Petitioner: MACKEY, RODNEY K., Sr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketW-PRIOR,NOTICE CONSENT TO P R; Comment: KAMALA MACKEY-DAVIS; Additional Info: Personal Representative: MACKEY, RODNEY K., Sr; Petitioner: MACKEY, RODNEY K., Sr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketW-PRIOR,NOTICE CONSENT TO P R; Comment: ANDREA MACKEY MALLARD; Additional Info: Personal Representative: MACKEY, RODNEY K., Sr; Petitioner: MACKEY, RODNEY K., Sr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketW-PRIOR,NOTICE CONSENT TO P R; Comment: GERALD ABDULWASI; Additional Info: Personal Representative: MACKEY, RODNEY K., Sr; Petitioner: MACKEY, RODNEY K., Sr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT NO FLA EST TAX DUE; Additional Info: Personal Representative: MACKEY, RODNEY K., Sr; Petitioner: MACKEY, RODNEY K., Sr

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BAYCARE HEALTH SYSTEM INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WILLIAMS , JOSEPH MAURICE