Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 07/12/2021 at 12:19:54 (UTC).

Milner, Erin vs Progressive Select Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 04/16/2021 Milner, Erin filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Progressive Select Insurance Company. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Battles, L. Emmett and Battles, Emmett. L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3236

  • Filing Date:

    04/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Battles, L. Emmett

Battles, Emmett. L

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MILNER, JEROME

Milner, Erin

Tampa, FL 33619

Defendant

Progressive Select Insurance Company

200 East Gaines Street

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCAZ , KENNETH ANTHONY

Attorney at GOLDEN SCAZ GAGAIN

1135 Marbella Plaza Dr

Tampa, FL 33619

Defendant Attorney

IHLER , CURTIS N

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF TERRYL BLACKMON WALKER

600 N West Shore Blvd Ste 300

Tampa, FL 33609

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

05/25/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

05/25/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

05/20/2021: MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

CIVIL COVER SHEET

04/16/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

04/16/2021: COMPLAINT

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

04/16/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

04/16/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

04/16/2021: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Comment: attached Orders in Opposition to Defendant Progressive Select Insurance Company s Motion for Protective Order.; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Milner, Erin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketMOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Milner, Erin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Milner, Erin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Milner, Erin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: Progressive Select Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: Progressive Select Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketDEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK; Additional Info: Defendant: Progressive Select Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK; Comment: W/ ATTACHMENT; Additional Info: Defendant: Progressive Select Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketATTACHMENT; Comment: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED ON PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY 4/28/2021 - CORPORATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Milner, Erin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Milner, Erin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Milner, Erin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Milner, Erin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X1; Additional Info: Defendant: Progressive Select Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCAZ , KENNETH ANTHONY