This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 01/28/2020 at 08:15:41 (UTC).

MILLS,JEFFREY D FNBF OF MILLS,LYNDSEY JORDAN (13) VS MILLS,LYNDA KAY

Case Summary

On 11/28/2018 MILLS,JEFFREY D FNBF OF MILLS,LYNDSEY JORDAN 13 filed a Family - Domestic Partnership Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against MILLS,LYNDA KAY. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Perrone, Frances M and Perrone, M. Frances. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8255

  • Filing Date:

    11/28/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Domestic Partnership Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Perrone, Frances M

Perrone, M. Frances

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MILLS, LYNDSEY

Ruskin, FL 33570

Respondent

MILLS, LYNDA K

Tampa, FL 33618

Not Classified By Court

MILLS, JEFFREY DAVID

Ruskin, FL 33570

Guardian Ad Litem

CHASE , JULIA BEST

Tampa, FL 33609

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

DANGELO , JENNIFER MARIE

Attorney at JENNIFER M. DANGELO, P.A.

3140 W Kennedy Blvd Ste 109

Tampa, FL 33609

Not Classified By Court Attorney

CHASE , JULIA BEST

Attorney at THE LAW OFFICES OF JULIA BEST CHASE, P.A

3202 Henderson Blvd Ste 202

Tampa, FL 33609

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/26/2019
  • DocketFILE RECEIVED AT RECORDS CENTER FOR STORAGE; Comment: 1vol

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • DocketFILE SENT TO RECORDS CENTER FOR STORAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • HearingOrder Setting Hearing; Hearing Time: 01:30 PM; Hearing Location: COURTROOM 302 3RD FL 800 E TWIGGS ST TAMPA, FL 33602; Judicial Officer: Perrone, Frances M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • DocketCOURT DOCKET PAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • DocketSHERIFF INFORMATION SHEET; Comment: FINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT INJUNCTION DOMESTIC VIOLENCE WITHOUT CHILDREN; Additional Info: Petitioner: MILLS, LYNDSEY; Respondent: MILLS, LYNDA K; Date Signed: 08/22/2019; Vol./Book: 26898, Page: 730, Number of Pages: 6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • DocketEMAIL SENT TO HCSO CIVIL PROCESSING UNIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • HearingOrder Setting Hearing; Hearing Time: 01:00 PM; Hearing Location: COURTROOM 302 3RD FL 800 E TWIGGS ST TAMPA, FL 33602; Judicial Officer: Perrone, Frances M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • DocketINJUNCTION PETITION RETURNED SERVED; Comment: AMDED OSH IN COURT; Additional Info: Respondent: MILLS, LYNDA K; Date Served: 07/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • DocketCOURT DOCKET PAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
55 More Docket Entries
  • 11/28/2018
  • DocketSHERIFF INFORMATION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • DocketDOMESTIC VIOLENCE INTAKE FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • DocketFILE HOME LOCATION IS TAMPA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • DocketPETITION FOR INJUNCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • DocketSRS NEW CASE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • DocketUNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY AND JURISDICTION ACT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • DocketPETITIONER COPY COVERSHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • DocketSTAY AWAY FROM; Comment: MARTINEZ MIDDLE SCHOOL;IDLEWILD BAPTIST CHURCH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • DocketORDER SETTING HEARING; Comment: Based on the facts stated in your petition, the court has set a hearing to take testimony and make a ruling on the petition. The hearing date is available at HOVER.hillsclerk.com on the Hearings tab of the case. A supplemental petition with additiona; Additional Info: Petitioner: MILLS, LYNDSEY; Respondent: MILLS, LYNDA K; Date 2: 11/28/2018

    Read MoreRead Less