Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 07/09/2021 at 10:53:09 (UTC).

Miller-Porter, Joyce A vs Porter, Duane A

Case Summary

On 04/16/2021 Miller-Porter, Joyce A filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Porter, Duane A. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Plant City Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Fuson, Robin. F. and Fuson, F.. Robin. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5289

  • Filing Date:

    04/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Plant City Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Fuson, Robin. F.

Fuson, F.. Robin

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Miller-Porter, Joyce A

Seffner, FL 33584

Respondent

Porter, Duane A

Bradenton, FL 34210

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT NON CONTESTED DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE; Additional Info: Petitioner: Miller-Porter, Joyce A; Respondent: Porter, Duane A; Signed: 06/03/2021; Judicial Officer: Fuson, Robin F.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketANSWER- WAIVER AND REQUEST FOR COPY OF FINAL JUDGMENT; Additional Info: Respondent: Porter, Duane A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketMOTION TO DEVIATE FROM CHILD SUPPORT GUIDELINES; Additional Info: Petitioner: Miller-Porter, Joyce A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketCHILD SUPPORT GUIDELINES WORKSHEET; Additional Info: Petitioner: Miller-Porter, Joyce A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketORDER SETTING HEARING; Comment: AND REQUIRING ELECTRONIC / TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Date 2: 04/28/2021; Judicial Officer: Fuson, Robin F.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF PARENTING CLASS COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF PARENTING CLASS COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketSTANDING TEMPORARY ORDER FOR FAMILY LAW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketSRS NEW CASE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketCOPY OF IDENTIFICATION; Additional Info: Respondent: Porter, Duane A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CURRENT ADDRESS; Additional Info: Respondent: Porter, Duane A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CURRENT ADDRESS; Additional Info: Respondent: Porter, Duane A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MANDATORY DISCLOSURE; Additional Info: Respondent: Porter, Duane A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketMARITAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT; Additional Info: Respondent: Porter, Duane A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketPARENTING PLAN; Additional Info: Respondent: Porter, Duane A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketPETITION FILED; Additional Info: Respondent: Porter, Duane A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASE; Additional Info: Respondent: Porter, Duane A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER; Additional Info: Respondent: Porter, Duane A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER; Additional Info: Respondent: Porter, Duane A

    Read MoreRead Less