This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 05/30/2023 at 00:08:26 (UTC).

MILL CITY MORTGAGE LOAN TRUST 2021-NMR1 vs Ferguson, Dorothy

Case Summary

On 01/23/2023 MILL CITY MORTGAGE LOAN TRUST 2021-NMR1 filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Ferguson, Dorothy. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Gabbard, Jennifer. X and Gabbard, X. Jennifer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0599

  • Filing Date:

    01/23/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Gabbard, Jennifer. X

Gabbard, X. Jennifer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MILL CITY MORTGAGE LOAN TRUST 2021-NMR1

Defendants

Ferguson, Dorothy

Unknown Spouse of Dorothy Ferguson a/k/a Dorothy A Ferguson

Unknown Tenant(s) in Possession #1

Unknown Tenant(s) in Possession #2

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROSALER , BRIAN LEE

 

Court Documents

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

04/26/2023: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

NOTICE OF HEARING

04/25/2023: NOTICE OF HEARING

AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE

04/24/2023: AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE

NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY(S)

04/24/2023: NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY(S)

MOTION TO - FOR

04/21/2023: MOTION TO - FOR

ORDER GRANTING

04/21/2023: ORDER GRANTING

AFFIDAVIT OF AMOUNT DUE

03/27/2023: AFFIDAVIT OF AMOUNT DUE

AFFIDAVIT AS TO ATTORNEY FEES

03/27/2023: AFFIDAVIT AS TO ATTORNEY FEES

AFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS

03/27/2023: AFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS

MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

03/27/2023: MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

03/03/2023: DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

MOTION FOR DEFAULT

02/27/2023: MOTION FOR DEFAULT

AFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE

02/27/2023: AFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

02/06/2023: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED

02/06/2023: SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/23/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

01/23/2023: COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/23/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/29/2023
  • HearingJAWS HEARING; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Hearing Location: 800 E. Twiggs St. Tampa, FL 33602 Room 503View Case Hearing Notice for Additional Details, as applicable.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2023
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Comment: SUPPORTING AFFIDAVIT AS TO ATTORNEY'S FEES ATTCHD; Additional Info: Plaintiff: MILL CITY MORTGAGE LOAN TRUST 2021-NMR1;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Additional Info: Plaintiff: MILL CITY MORTGAGE LOAN TRUST 2021-NMR1;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING; Comment: VIA ZOOM June 29, 2023 at 11:00 AM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: MILL CITY MORTGAGE LOAN TRUST 2021-NMR1;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY(S); Additional Info: Plaintiff: MILL CITY MORTGAGE LOAN TRUST 2021-NMR1;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: MILL CITY MORTGAGE LOAN TRUST 2021-NMR1;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO - FOR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER GRANTING; Comment: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO WAIVE MEDIATION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: MILL CITY MORTGAGE LOAN TRUST 2021-NMR1; Date Signed: 04/21/2023; Judicial Officer:: Gabbard, Jennifer X;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2023
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Comment: ATTACHED: ORIGINAL NOTE, ORIGINAL LOAN MODIFICATION AND ORIGINAL MORTGAGE (MAILED TO CLERK FROM PLNTFF 3/27/23); Additional Info: Plaintiff: MILL CITY MORTGAGE LOAN TRUST 2021-NMR1;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF AMOUNT DUE; Comment: AND OWING; Additional Info: Plaintiff: MILL CITY MORTGAGE LOAN TRUST 2021-NMR1;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 01/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: MILL CITY MORTGAGE LOAN TRUST 2021-NMR1;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: MILL CITY MORTGAGE LOAN TRUST 2021-NMR1;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVALUE OF MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE REAL PROPERTY CLAIM FORM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: MILL CITY MORTGAGE LOAN TRUST 2021-NMR1;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: MILL CITY MORTGAGE LOAN TRUST 2021-NMR1;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: MILL CITY MORTGAGE LOAN TRUST 2021-NMR1;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: MILL CITY MORTGAGE LOAN TRUST 2021-NMR1;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStreamlined Differentiated Case Management Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS (RECORDABLE); Additional Info: Defendant: Ferguson, Dorothy; Defendant: Unknown Spouse of Dorothy Ferguson a/k/a Dorothy A Ferguson; Defendant: Unknown Tenant(s) in Possession #1; Defendant: Unknown Tenant(s) in Possession #2; Plaintiff: MILL CITY MORTGAGE LOAN TRUST 2021-NMR1;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X2; Additional Info: Defendant: Ferguson, Dorothy; Defendant: Unknown Tenant(s) in Possession #1;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less