This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 01/13/2022 at 20:43:14 (UTC).

Midland Credit Management Inc. vs Turner, Kimberly K

Case Summary

On 11/19/2021 Midland Credit Management Inc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Turner, Kimberly K. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Criminal Court Annex located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Valkenburg, V.. Miriam, Valkenburg, Miriam. V., Valkenburg, Miriam V., Allen, A. Lisa, Allen, Lisa. A and Allen, Lisa A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3560

  • Filing Date:

    11/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Valkenburg, V.. Miriam

Valkenburg, Miriam. V.

Valkenburg, Miriam V.

Allen, A. Lisa

Allen, Lisa. A

Allen, Lisa A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Midland Credit Management Inc.

Po Box 290335

Tampa, FL 33687

Defendant

Turner, Kimberly K

Tampa, FL 33626-3615

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LEHMANN , COLLEEN E

Attorney at MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC.

Po Box 290335

Tampa, FL 33687

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

11/19/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/19/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

11/22/2021: E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

11/19/2021: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

12/06/2021: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2022
  • HearingPRETRIAL; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Hearing Location: COURTROOM 305 800 E TWIGGS ST TAMPA, FL 33602; Judicial Officer: Allen, Lisa A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED; Comment: KIMBERLY K TURNER, 12/06/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET; Additional Info: Defendant: Turner, Kimberly K

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Midland Credit Management Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Midland Credit Management Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Midland Credit Management Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Midland Credit Management Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Credit Management, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEHMANN, COLLEEN E