This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 09/15/2021 at 20:56:40 (UTC).

Midland Credit Management Inc vs Smouse, Michael

Case Summary

On 06/25/2021 Midland Credit Management Inc filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against Smouse, Michael. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Allen, A. Lisa, Allen, Lisa A and Allen, Lisa. A. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1421

  • Filing Date:

    06/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Allen, A. Lisa

Allen, Lisa A

Allen, Lisa. A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Midland Credit Management Inc

887 Donald Ross Road

Juno Beach, FL 33408

Defendant

Smouse, Michael

Tampa, FL 33610

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WALKER , SHARON JANICE

Attorney at ANDREU, PALMA, LAVIN & SOLIS, PLLC

887 Donald Ross Rd

Juno Beach, FL 33408

Defendant Attorney

RUBIN , ARTHUR DREW

Attorney at WE PROTECT CONSUMERS, P.A.

Po Box 89282

Tampa, FL 33689

 

Court Documents

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

09/03/2021: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

08/17/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

07/07/2021: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

06/29/2021: E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

CIVIL COVER SHEET

06/25/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

06/25/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

06/25/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketORDER REFERRING PARTIES TO MEDIATION; Additional Info: Judicial Officer: Allen, Lisa A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • JudgementJudgment Code: NOVD; Judgment Description: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Instrument Number: 2021459240; Judge: Allen, Lisa A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketORDER REFERRING PARTIES TO MEDIATION; Additional Info: Date Signed: 09/02/2021; Judicial Officer: Allen, Lisa A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • HearingPRETRIAL; Hearing Time: 09:30 AM; Hearing Location: COURTROOM 306 800 E TWIGGS ST TAMPA, FL 33602; Judicial Officer: Allen, Lisa A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketCOURT TICKET; Comment: AT PRETRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: Smouse, Michael

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED; Comment: 07-06-21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET; Additional Info: Defendant: Smouse, Michael

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Midland Credit Management Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Midland Credit Management Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Midland Credit Management Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO RULE 2-420; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Midland Credit Management Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Midland Credit Management Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Credit Management, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RUBIN ARTHUR D