This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 09/22/2021 at 20:27:11 (UTC).

Midland Credit Management Inc vs Rives, Yadira T

Case Summary

On 07/09/2021 Midland Credit Management Inc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Rives, Yadira T. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Criminal Court Annex located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Valkenburg, V.. Miriam and Valkenburg, Miriam. V.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5489

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Valkenburg, V.. Miriam

Valkenburg, Miriam. V.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Midland Credit Management Inc

887 Donald Ross Road

Juno Beach, FL 33408

Defendant

Rives, Yadira T

Tampa, FL 33625-4975

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MOORE , ASHLEY LENEE

Attorney at KELLEY KRONENBERG

1475 Centrepark Blvd Ste 275

West Palm Beach, FL 33401

 

Court Documents

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

08/24/2021: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

General Differentiated Case Management Order

07/12/2021: General Differentiated Case Management Order

NO SUMMONS ISSUED

07/12/2021: NO SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

07/09/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

07/09/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

07/09/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

07/09/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/31/2021
  • Docket20 DAYS SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED; Comment: YADIRA T RIVES 8/30/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: Rives, Yadira T

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Midland Credit Management Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNO SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: FEES PAID - eservice@andreupalma.com

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Midland Credit Management Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Midland Credit Management Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Midland Credit Management Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO RULE 2-420; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Midland Credit Management Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Midland Credit Management Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Credit Management, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MOORE , ASHLEY L