This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 09/21/2021 at 01:03:58 (UTC).

Midland Credit Management Inc vs Ramirez, Sergio

Case Summary

On 07/09/2021 Midland Credit Management Inc filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against Ramirez, Sergio. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Criminal Court Annex located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Valkenburg, V.. Miriam, Valkenburg, Miriam. V. and Valkenburg, Miriam V.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5466

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Valkenburg, V.. Miriam

Valkenburg, Miriam. V.

Valkenburg, Miriam V.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Midland Credit Management Inc

887 Donald Ross Road

Juno Beach, FL 33408

Defendant

Ramirez, Sergio

Apollo Beach, FL 33572-2624

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAVIN , DESIREE MARIA

Attorney at ANDREU, PALMA, LAVIN & SOLIS, PLLC

815 Nw 57Th Ave Ste 401

Miami, FL 33126

 

Court Documents

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

08/24/2021: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

08/04/2021: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

07/28/2021: E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

CIVIL COVER SHEET

07/09/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

07/09/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

07/09/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/18/2021
  • HearingPRETRIAL; Cancelled Comments: Voluntary Dismissal of Cause; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Hearing Location: COURTROOM 305 800 E TWIGGS ST TAMPA, FL 33602; Judicial Officer: Valkenburg, Miriam V.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • JudgementJudgment Code: NOVD; Judgment Description: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Instrument Number: 2021438146; Judge: Valkenburg, Miriam V.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED; Comment: SERGIO RAMIREZ 08/03/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET; Additional Info: Defendant: Ramirez, Sergio

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Midland Credit Management Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Midland Credit Management Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Midland Credit Management Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO RULE 2-420; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Midland Credit Management Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Midland Credit Management Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Credit Management, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LAVIN DESIREE M