This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 09/01/2022 at 06:39:51 (UTC).

Midland Credit Management Inc. vs Plasencia, Omar

Case Summary

On 03/08/2022 Midland Credit Management Inc filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against Plasencia, Omar. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Hooi, Michael J, Hooi, Michael. J and Hooi, J. Michael. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5304

  • Filing Date:

    03/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Hooi, Michael J

Hooi, Michael. J

Hooi, J. Michael

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Midland Credit Management Inc.

Po Box 290335

Tampa, FL 33687

Defendant

Plasencia, Omar

Wimauma, FL 33598-2224

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

HORNE , MELISSA CAROLYN

Attorney at MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC.

Po Box 290335

Tampa, FL 33687

HOFFMAN , ROBERT J

Attorney at ROBERT J. HOFFMAN, ESQUIRE

1330 Main St Fl 2 Ste 12

Sarasota, FL 34236

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

03/08/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

03/08/2022: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

03/08/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

03/09/2022: E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED

04/05/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED

NOTICE OF LIMITED REPRESENTATION

04/07/2022: NOTICE OF LIMITED REPRESENTATION

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

08/31/2022: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Midland Credit Management Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • HearingPRETRIAL; Cancelled Comments: Non-Service on Summons; Hearing Time: 09:30 AM; Hearing Location: HTTPS://ZOOM.US/J/82393131402 MEETING ID: 823 9313 1402NO PASSWORD REQUIRED Judicial Officer: Hooi, Michael J

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIMITED REPRESENTATION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Midland Credit Management Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED; Comment: OMAR PLASENCIA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET; Additional Info: Defendant: Plasencia, Omar

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Midland Credit Management Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Midland Credit Management Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Midland Credit Management Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Midland Credit Management Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less