This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 08/08/2022 at 00:57:23 (UTC).

Midland Credit Management Inc. vs Pieteris, Arturas

Case Summary

On 07/01/2022 Midland Credit Management Inc filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against Pieteris, Arturas. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Murphy, J. Logan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7378

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Murphy, J. Logan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Midland Credit Management Inc.

Po Box 290335

Tampa, FL 33687

Defendant

Pieteris, Arturas

Valrico, FL 33594-6656

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GREEN , JOHAN ALEXI

Attorney at MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC.

Po Box 290335

Tampa, FL 33687

Defendant Attorney

SHIPWASH , TENNILLE M.

Attorney at SHIPWASH LAW FIRM PA

225 S Swoope Ave Ste 110

Maitland, FL 32751

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

07/01/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

07/01/2022: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

07/01/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

07/06/2022: E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

SUMMONS RETURNED SUBSTITUTE SERVICE

07/11/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED SUBSTITUTE SERVICE

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

07/01/2022: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

MOTION TO INVOKE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

08/02/2022: MOTION TO INVOKE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

08/02/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

08/05/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/08/2022
  • HearingPRETRIAL; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Hearing Location: COURTROOM 312 800 E TWIGGS ST TAMPA, FL 33602; Judicial Officer: Murphy, J. Logan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Midland Credit Management Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: Pieteris, Arturas

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO INVOKE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE; Additional Info: Defendant: Pieteris, Arturas

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SUBSTITUTE SERVICE; Comment: ARTURAS PIETERIS 7/11/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET; Additional Info: Defendant: Pieteris, Arturas

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Midland Credit Management Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Midland Credit Management Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Midland Credit Management Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Midland Credit Management Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Credit Management, Inc. is a litigant