This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 05/19/2022 at 03:02:38 (UTC).

Midland Credit Management Inc vs Obrien, Dawn

Case Summary

On 01/21/2022 Midland Credit Management Inc filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against Obrien, Dawn. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Schultz-Kin, Leslie. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4413

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Schultz-Kin, Leslie

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Midland Credit Management Inc

887 Donald Ross Road

Juno Beach, FL 33408

Defendant

Obrien, Dawn

Ruskin, FL 33573-6781

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PILIUIKO , OLEKSANDRA

Attorney at ANDREU, PALMA, LAVIN & SOLIS, PLLC

887 Donald Ross Rd

Juno Beach, FL 33408

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

01/21/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

01/21/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/21/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

01/24/2022: E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

02/01/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

04/26/2022: DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

COURT TICKET

04/26/2022: COURT TICKET

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2022
  • HearingPRETRIAL; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Hearing Location: COURTROOM 312 800 E TWIGGS ST TAMPA, FL 33602; Judicial Officer: Schultz-Kin, Leslie

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT TICKET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK; Comment: AT PRETRIAL; Additional Info: Defendant: Obrien, Dawn

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED; Comment: DAWN OBRIEN, 1/31/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET; Additional Info: Defendant: Obrien, Dawn

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Midland Credit Management Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Midland Credit Management Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Midland Credit Management Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO RULE 2-420; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Midland Credit Management Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Midland Credit Management Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Credit Management, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PILIUIKO , OLEKSANDRA