This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 09/18/2021 at 02:00:01 (UTC).

Midland Credit Management Inc vs Murphey, Conor

Case Summary

On 07/09/2021 Midland Credit Management Inc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Murphey, Conor. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Allen, A. Lisa and Allen, Lisa. A. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5679

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Allen, A. Lisa

Allen, Lisa. A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Midland Credit Management Inc

887 Donald Ross Road

Juno Beach, FL 33408

Defendant

Murphey, Conor

Valrico, FL 33594

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HERNANDEZ , ILIANA MERCEDES

Attorney at ANDREU, PALMA, LAVIN & SOLIS, PLLC

815 Nw 57Th Ave Ste 401

Miami, FL 33126

Defendant Attorney

SINGLETON , RYAN NORMAN

Attorney at HOLLAND LAW GROUP

3639 Cortez Rd W Ste 130

Bradenton, FL 34210

 

Court Documents

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

07/13/2021: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

General Differentiated Case Management Order

07/13/2021: General Differentiated Case Management Order

COMPLAINT

07/09/2021: COMPLAINT

COMPLAINT

07/09/2021: COMPLAINT

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

07/09/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

07/09/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

07/09/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

07/09/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/10/2021
  • JudgementJudgment Code: NOVD; Judgment Description: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Instrument Number: 2021409668; Judge: Allen, Lisa A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: Murphey, Conor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: Murphey, Conor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Midland Credit Management Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Midland Credit Management Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Midland Credit Management Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO RULE 2-420; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Midland Credit Management Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Midland Credit Management Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Credit Management, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RYAN N SINGLETON