This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 01/15/2023 at 12:42:56 (UTC).

Midland Credit Management, Inc. vs Martinez, Yesenia

Case Summary

On 11/03/2022 Midland Credit Management, Inc filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against Martinez, Yesenia. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Plant City Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Allen, A. Lisa, Scott., Monique M, Scott., M. Monique and Scott., Monique. M. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4687

  • Filing Date:

    11/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Allen, A. Lisa

Scott., Monique M

Scott., M. Monique

Scott., Monique. M

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Midland Credit Management, Inc.

887 Donald Ross Road

Juno Beach, FL 33408

Defendant

Martinez, Yesenia

Plant City, FL 33563-3933

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MOEHLE , KRISTINA BIANCA

Attorney at ANDREU, PALMA, LAVIN & SOLIS, PLLC

887 Donald Ross Rd

Juno Beach, FL 33408

PILIUIKO , OLEKSANDRA

Attorney at ANDREU, PALMA, LAVIN & SOLIS, PLLC

887 Donald Ross Rd

Juno Beach, FL 33408

Defendant Attorney

DRACH , JUSTIN SETH

Attorney at THOELE - DRACH

3744 Dupont Station Ct S

Jacksonville, FL 32217

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

11/03/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

11/03/2022: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

11/03/2022: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/03/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

11/04/2022: E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

SUMMONS RETURNED SUBSTITUTE SERVICE

11/11/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED SUBSTITUTE SERVICE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

11/17/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE

11/30/2022: NOTICE

NOTICE OF LIMITED REPRESENTATION

12/02/2022: NOTICE OF LIMITED REPRESENTATION

COURT TICKET

12/07/2022: COURT TICKET

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

12/15/2022: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

12/15/2022: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/15/2022
  • JudgementJudgment Code: NOVD; Judgment Description: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Instrument Number: 2022593190; Judge: Scott., Monique M

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • HearingPRETRIAL; Hearing Time: 02:00 PM; Hearing Location: COUNTY CIVIL VIRTUAL COURT VIA ZOOM/TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE INSTRUCTIONS ON REVERSE SIDE - DO NOT COME TO COURTHOUSEMEETING ID: 402 763 9381 - NO PASSWORD IS REQUIRED; Judicial Officer: Scott., Monique M

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT TICKET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIMITED REPRESENTATION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Midland Credit Management, Inc.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE; Comment: OF SETTLEMENT; Additional Info: Defendant: Martinez, Yesenia;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: Martinez, Yesenia;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SUBSTITUTE SERVICE; Comment: YESENIA MARTINEZ 11/10/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET; Additional Info: Defendant: Martinez, Yesenia;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Midland Credit Management, Inc.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Midland Credit Management, Inc.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Midland Credit Management, Inc.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Midland Credit Management, Inc.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less