This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 01/16/2023 at 18:28:49 (UTC).

Midland Credit Management, Inc. vs Marcus, Ronald

Case Summary

On 10/21/2022 Midland Credit Management, Inc filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against Marcus, Ronald. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Plant City Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Murphy, J. Logan, Weis, Richard. A, Weis, Richard A and Weis, A. Richard. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0581

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Murphy, J. Logan

Weis, Richard. A

Weis, Richard A

Weis, A. Richard

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Midland Credit Management, Inc.

887 Donald Ross Road

Juno Beach, FL 33408

Defendant

Marcus, Ronald

Thonotosassa, FL 33592-3799

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MOEHLE , KRISTINA BIANCA

Attorney at ANDREU, PALMA, LAVIN & SOLIS, PLLC

887 Donald Ross Rd

Juno Beach, FL 33408

PILIUIKO , OLEKSANDRA

Attorney at ANDREU, PALMA, LAVIN & SOLIS, PLLC

887 Donald Ross Rd

Juno Beach, FL 33408

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

10/21/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

10/21/2022: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

10/21/2022: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

CIVIL COVER SHEET

10/21/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

10/22/2022: E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

11/10/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

NOTICE OF LIMITED REPRESENTATION

12/02/2022: NOTICE OF LIMITED REPRESENTATION

COURT TICKET

12/07/2022: COURT TICKET

NOTICE OF LIMITED REPRESENTATION

12/07/2022: NOTICE OF LIMITED REPRESENTATION

JUDGE'S COPIES OF PLEADINGS

01/12/2023: JUDGE'S COPIES OF PLEADINGS

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/12/2023
  • JudgementJudgment Code: ODISM; Judgment Description: ORDER OF DISMISSAL; Instrument Number: 2023015965; Judge: Weis, Richard A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGE'S COPIES OF PLEADINGS; Comment: EMAIL CORRESPONDENCE FROM JUDGE'S JA TO ATTORNEY DATED 1.6.2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • HearingPRETRIAL; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Hearing Location: PLANT CITY COURTHOUSE, COURTROOM 3 301 N MICHIGAN AVE PLANT CITY, FL 33563;; Judicial Officer: Weis, Richard A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIMITED REPRESENTATION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Midland Credit Management, Inc.; Private Attorney: GRAY , PORTIA CAMBEL;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT TICKET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIMITED REPRESENTATION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Midland Credit Management, Inc.; Private Attorney: CHEREPKAI , HEATHER DAWN; Private Attorney: MOEHLE , KRISTINA BIANCA;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED; Additional Info: Defendant: Marcus, Ronald; Date Served: 11/09/2022;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET; Additional Info: Defendant: Marcus, Ronald;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Midland Credit Management, Inc.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Midland Credit Management, Inc.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Midland Credit Management, Inc.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Midland Credit Management, Inc.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less