This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 08/08/2022 at 01:02:57 (UTC).

Midland Credit Management Inc. vs Lindsey, Deonna T

Case Summary

On 07/01/2022 Midland Credit Management Inc filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against Lindsey, Deonna T. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Giardina, James. S, Giardina, S. James and Giardina, James S. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7384

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Giardina, James. S

Giardina, S. James

Giardina, James S

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Midland Credit Management Inc.

Po Box 290335

Tampa, FL 33687

Defendant

Lindsey, Deonna T

Riverview, FL 33579-4039

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FITZPATRICK , MOLLY KATHLEEN

Attorney at FITZPATRICK & FITZPATRICK, PA

213 N Apopka Ave

Inverness, FL 34450

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

07/01/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

07/01/2022: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

07/01/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

07/06/2022: E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

SUMMONS RETURNED SUBSTITUTE SERVICE

07/12/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED SUBSTITUTE SERVICE

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/07/2022
  • HearingPRETRIAL; Hearing Time: 01:00 PM; Hearing Location: HTTPS://ZOOM.US/J/97219657408 ZOOM MEETING ID IS 972-1965-7408PASSWORD IS 031612 Judicial Officer: Giardina, James S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SUBSTITUTE SERVICE; Comment: DEONNA T LINDSEY 07/11/2022; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Midland Credit Management Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET; Additional Info: Defendant: Lindsey, Deonna T

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Midland Credit Management Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Midland Credit Management Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Midland Credit Management Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Midland Credit Management Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Credit Management, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FITZPATRICK, MOLLY KATHLEEN