This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 06/30/2022 at 00:47:40 (UTC).

Midland Credit Management Inc. vs Lago, Duniesky

Case Summary

On 05/13/2022 Midland Credit Management Inc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Lago, Duniesky. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Murphy, J. Logan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1584

  • Filing Date:

    05/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Murphy, J. Logan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Midland Credit Management Inc.

Po Box 290335

Tampa, FL 33687

Defendant

Lago, Duniesky

Tampa, FL 33634-7308

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FITZPATRICK , MOLLY KATHLEEN

Attorney at MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC.

Po Box 290335

Tampa, FL 33687

 

Court Documents

E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

05/13/2022: E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

05/13/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

05/13/2022: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

05/13/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED

06/21/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED

SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED

06/21/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

06/24/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/27/2022
  • HearingPRETRIAL; Cancelled Comments: Non-Service on Summons; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Hearing Location: COURTROOM 312 800 E TWIGGS ST TAMPA, FL 33602; Judicial Officer: Murphy, J. Logan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Midland Credit Management Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED; Comment: DUNIESKY LAGO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED; Comment: DUNIESKY LAGO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Midland Credit Management Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Midland Credit Management Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Midland Credit Management Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Midland Credit Management Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET; Additional Info: Defendant: Lago, Duniesky

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Credit Management, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FITZPATRICK, MOLLY KATHLEEN