Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 05/28/2021 at 17:57:48 (UTC).

Midland Credit Management Inc. vs Johnson, Frederick

Case Summary

On 04/16/2021 Midland Credit Management Inc filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against Johnson, Frederick. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Costello, Jessica. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6763

  • Filing Date:

    04/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Costello, Jessica

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Midland Credit Management Inc.

Po Box 290335

Tampa, FL 33687

Defendant

Johnson, Frederick

Tampa, FL 33607

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

OBI , VALERIA I.

Attorney at MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC.

Po Box 290335

Tampa, FL 33687

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

04/23/2021: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

04/21/2021: E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

CIVIL COVER SHEET

04/16/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

04/16/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/19/2021
  • HearingPRETRIAL; Hearing Time: 02:00 PM; Hearing Location: COURTROOM 303 800 E TWIGGS ST TAMPA, FL 33602; Judicial Officer: Costello, Jessica

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED; Comment: FREDERICK JOHNSON 4/23/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET; Additional Info: Defendant: Johnson, Frederick

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Midland Credit Management Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Midland Credit Management Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Midland Credit Management Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Midland Credit Management Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Credit Management, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer OBI , VALERIA