This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 08/11/2022 at 09:16:38 (UTC).

Midland Credit Management Inc. vs Hancock, Sandra D

Case Summary

On 07/01/2022 Midland Credit Management Inc filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against Hancock, Sandra D. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Murphy, J. Logan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7381

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Murphy, J. Logan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Midland Credit Management Inc.

Po Box 290335

Tampa, FL 33687

Defendant

Hancock, Sandra D

Valrico, FL 33596-5700

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HORNE , MELISSA CAROLYN

Attorney at MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC.

Po Box 290335

Tampa, FL 33687

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

07/01/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

07/01/2022: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

07/01/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

07/06/2022: E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

SUMMONS RETURNED SUBSTITUTE SERVICE

07/11/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED SUBSTITUTE SERVICE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

08/05/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

ORDER REFERRING PARTIES TO MEDIATION

08/08/2022: ORDER REFERRING PARTIES TO MEDIATION

COURT TICKET

08/08/2022: COURT TICKET

NOTICE OF COURT ORDERED MEDIATION

08/09/2022: NOTICE OF COURT ORDERED MEDIATION

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT ORDERED MEDIATION; Comment: 9/8/22 @ 1:00 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • HearingPRETRIAL; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Hearing Location: COURTROOM 312 800 E TWIGGS ST TAMPA, FL 33602; Judicial Officer: Murphy, J. Logan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT TICKET; Comment: PRETRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER REFERRING PARTIES TO MEDIATION; Additional Info: Date Signed: 08/08/2022; Judicial Officer: Murphy, J. Logan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Midland Credit Management Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SUBSTITUTE SERVICE; Comment: SANDRA D HANCOCK 7/11/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET; Additional Info: Defendant: Hancock, Sandra D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Midland Credit Management Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Midland Credit Management Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Midland Credit Management Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Midland Credit Management Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Credit Management, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HORNE , MELISSA