This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 09/08/2021 at 19:58:38 (UTC).

Midland Credit Management Inc vs Gill, Christian

Case Summary

On 07/09/2021 Midland Credit Management Inc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Gill, Christian. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Bagge-Hernandez, Michael. C and Bagge-Hernandez, C. Michael. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5683

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Bagge-Hernandez, Michael. C

Bagge-Hernandez, C. Michael

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Midland Credit Management Inc

887 Donald Ross Road

Juno Beach, FL 33408

Defendant

Gill, Christian

Wimauma, FL 33598

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MOEHLE , KRISTINA BIANCA

Attorney at ANDREU, PALMA, LAVIN & SOLIS, PLLC

887 Donald Ross Rd

Juno Beach, FL 33408

 

Court Documents

MOTION

07/27/2021: MOTION

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

07/13/2021: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

General Differentiated Case Management Order

07/13/2021: General Differentiated Case Management Order

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

07/09/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

07/09/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

07/09/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

07/09/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/02/2021
  • JudgementJudgment Code: OAS; Judgment Description: ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION; Instrument Number: 2021386267; Judge: Bagge-Hernandez, Michael C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketORDER APPROVING STIPULATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION; Comment: TO ADOPT SETTLEMENT STIPULATION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Midland Credit Management Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: Gill, Christian

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Midland Credit Management Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Midland Credit Management Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Midland Credit Management Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO RULE 2-420; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Midland Credit Management Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Midland Credit Management Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Credit Management, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Moehle, Kristina B