This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 03/05/2023 at 00:41:21 (UTC).

Midland Credit Management, Inc. vs Garner, Sharon

Case Summary

On 06/22/2021 Midland Credit Management, Inc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Garner, Sharon. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Moody, James S, III, Moody, S. James, Giardina, James. S and Giardina, S. James. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9561

  • Filing Date:

    06/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Moody, James S, III

Moody, S. James

Giardina, James. S

Giardina, S. James

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Midland Credit Management, Inc.

Defendant

Garner, Sharon

Garnishee

AVAYA INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

PILIUIKO , OLEKSANDRA

MONTERO , ANDRES

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF CONTINUING GARNISHMENT ISSUED

08/23/2022: WRIT OF CONTINUING GARNISHMENT ISSUED

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE

08/23/2022: CLERK'S CERTIFICATE

E-FILED MOTION FOR CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT

08/17/2022: E-FILED MOTION FOR CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT

FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT

02/16/2022: FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT

AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS AND INTEREST

02/04/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS AND INTEREST

AFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE

02/04/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE

COURT TICKET

02/02/2022: COURT TICKET

NOTICE OF HEARING

12/27/2021: NOTICE OF HEARING

COURT TICKET

10/20/2021: COURT TICKET

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER APPROVING GARNISHMENT STIPULATION; Comment: AND FINAL JUDGMENT OF CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; Additional Info: Defendant: Garner, Sharon; Garnishee: AVAYA INC; Plaintiff: Midland Credit Management, Inc.; Judicial Officer:: Giardina, James S;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO - FOR; Comment: ADOPT STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT OF CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Midland Credit Management, Inc.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE; Comment: PURSUANT TO FS 77.041 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT OF GARNISHMENT RETURNED SERVED; Comment: 9/21/22 AVAYA INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT OF CONTINUING GARNISHMENT ISSUED; Comment: 8/18/22 JSG garnishments@andreupalma.com; Additional Info: Defendant: Garner, Sharon; Garnishee: AVAYA INC; Date Signed: 08/18/2022; Judicial Officer:: Giardina, James S;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE; Comment: WOCGI; Additional Info: Defendant: Garner, Sharon; Garnishee: AVAYA INC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED MOTION FOR CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Midland Credit Management, Inc.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • JudgementJudgment Code: FSJ; Judgment Description: FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT; Instrument Number: 2022087440; Judge: Giardina, James S

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF COSTS AND INTEREST

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 10/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER; Comment: ZOOM NOTICE AND POSSIBLE WAIVER OF APPEARANCE AT SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL CONFERENCE BY FILING ANSWER FORM OR SETTLEMENT STIPULATION; Additional Info: Date 2: 10/11/2021; Judicial Officer:: Moody, James S, III;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED; Comment: SHARON GARNER 6/30/21

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET; Additional Info: Defendant: Garner, Sharon;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Midland Credit Management, Inc.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Midland Credit Management, Inc.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Midland Credit Management, Inc.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO RULE 2-420; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Midland Credit Management, Inc.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Midland Credit Management, Inc.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less