This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 12/29/2022 at 06:07:14 (UTC).

Midland Credit Management Inc. vs Clark, Andrew

Case Summary

On 11/10/2022 Midland Credit Management Inc filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against Clark, Andrew. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Tompkins, Joseph M, Tompkins, M. Joseph and Tompkins, Joseph. M. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8419

  • Filing Date:

    11/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Tompkins, Joseph M

Tompkins, M. Joseph

Tompkins, Joseph. M

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Midland Credit Management Inc.

Po Box 290335

Tampa, FL 33687

Defendant

Clark, Andrew

Riverview, FL 33578-4832

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

CHATANI , PAYAL YASHWANT

Attorney at MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC

Po Box 290335

Tampa, FL 33687

HORNE , MELISSA CAROLYN

Attorney at MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC.

Po Box 290335

Tampa, FL 33687

NARANJO-NAVARRO, EILEEN E

Attorney at HLA LAW GROUP

9415 Sw 72Nd St Ste 151

Miami, FL 33173

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

11/10/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

11/10/2022: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/10/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

11/16/2022: E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

11/19/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

12/02/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

COURT TICKET

12/14/2022: COURT TICKET

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

12/14/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/14/2022
  • HearingPRETRIAL; Cancelled Comments: SET IN ERROR; Hearing Time: 09:30 AM; Hearing Location: HTTPS://ZOOM.US/J/9580902034 MEETING ID: 958 090 2034PASSWORD: NOT REQUIRED; Judicial Officer: Tompkins, Joseph M

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • HearingPRETRIAL; Hearing Time: 09:30 AM; Hearing Location: HTTPS://ZOOM.US/J/9580902034 MEETING ID: 958 090 2034PASSWORD: NOT REQUIRED; Judicial Officer: Tompkins, Joseph M

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Midland Credit Management Inc.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT TICKET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Midland Credit Management Inc.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET; Additional Info: Defendant: Clark, Andrew;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Midland Credit Management Inc.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Midland Credit Management Inc.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Midland Credit Management Inc.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Midland Credit Management Inc.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less