This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 08/26/2022 at 00:41:54 (UTC).

Midland Credit Management, Inc. vs Bowden, Thomasina Y

Case Summary

On 08/12/2022 Midland Credit Management, Inc filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against Bowden, Thomasina Y. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Criminal Court Annex located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Allen, A. Lisa, Allen, Lisa. A and Allen, Lisa A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5460

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Allen, A. Lisa

Allen, Lisa. A

Allen, Lisa A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Midland Credit Management, Inc.

887 Donald Ross Road

Juno Beach, FL 33408

Defendant

Bowden, Thomasina Y

Tampa, FL 33619-6939

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PILIUIKO , OLEKSANDRA

Attorney at ANDREU, PALMA, LAVIN & SOLIS, PLLC

887 Donald Ross Rd

Juno Beach, FL 33408

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

08/12/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

08/12/2022: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

08/12/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

08/15/2022: E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

SUMMONS RETURNED SUBSTITUTE SERVICE

08/22/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED SUBSTITUTE SERVICE

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/11/2022
  • HearingPRETRIAL; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Hearing Location: COURTROOM 305 800 E TWIGGS ST TAMPA, FL 33602; Judicial Officer: Allen, Lisa A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SUBSTITUTE SERVICE; Comment: THOMASINA Y BOWDEN 08/20/2022; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Midland Credit Management, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET; Additional Info: Defendant: Bowden, Thomasina Y

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Midland Credit Management, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Midland Credit Management, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Midland Credit Management, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Midland Credit Management, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Credit Management, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PILIUIKO , OLEKSANDRA