This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 03/21/2023 at 02:39:06 (UTC).

MIDFLORIDA Credit Union vs Dalce, Raynold

Case Summary

On 01/29/2023 MIDFLORIDA Credit Union filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Dalce, Raynold. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Murphy, J. Logan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7985

  • Filing Date:

    01/29/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Murphy, J. Logan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDFLORIDA Credit Union

Po Box 8008

Lakeland, FL 33802

Defendants

Dalce, Raynold

Ruskin, FL 33570

Raymond, Tatiana

Ruskin, FL 33570

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CORRALES , ARTHUR STEPHEN

Attorney at ARTHUR S. CORRALES, ESQ.

Po Box 340687

Tampa, FL 33694

Defendant Attorney

CARPENTER , GARY GEORGE

Attorney at GARY G. CARPENTER, P.L.

2861 Executive Dr Ste 200

Clearwater, FL 33762

 

Court Documents

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

01/29/2023: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

01/29/2023: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

01/29/2023: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/29/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

01/29/2023: COMPLAINT

General Differentiated Case Management Order

01/30/2023: General Differentiated Case Management Order

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

01/30/2023: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

01/30/2023: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED

02/21/2023: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED

02/21/2023: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED

MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME

02/23/2023: MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

02/23/2023: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

02/28/2023: ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Additional Info: Defendant: Dalce, Raynold; Date 2: 02/28/2023; Judicial Officer:: Murphy, J. Logan;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: Dalce, Raynold; Defendant: Raymond, Tatiana;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME; Additional Info: Defendant: Dalce, Raynold;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED; Comment: RAYNOLD DALCE 2/3/23; Additional Info: Plaintiff: MIDFLORIDA Credit Union;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED; Comment: TATIANA RAYMOND 2/3/23; Additional Info: Plaintiff: MIDFLORIDA Credit Union;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: Dalce, Raynold;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: Raymond, Tatiana;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2023
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2023
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: MIDFLORIDA Credit Union;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: MIDFLORIDA Credit Union;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: MIDFLORIDA Credit Union;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: MIDFLORIDA Credit Union;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: MIDFLORIDA Credit Union;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less