This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 03/28/2023 at 05:53:42 (UTC).

MIDFLORIDA Credit Union vs Armstrong, John Fitzgerald, Jr

Case Summary

On 01/29/2023 MIDFLORIDA Credit Union filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Armstrong, John Fitzgerald, Jr. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Murphy, J. Logan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7990

  • Filing Date:

    01/29/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Murphy, J. Logan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDFLORIDA Credit Union

Po Box 8008

Lakeland, FL 33802

Defendant

Armstrong, John Fitzgerald, Jr

Tampa, FL 33647

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CORRALES , ARTHUR STEPHEN

Attorney at ARTHUR S. CORRALES, ESQ.

Po Box 340687

Tampa, FL 33694

 

Court Documents

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

01/29/2023: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

01/29/2023: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/29/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

General Differentiated Case Management Order

01/30/2023: General Differentiated Case Management Order

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

01/30/2023: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED

02/13/2023: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED

ANSWER

02/27/2023: ANSWER

AFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEY

03/02/2023: AFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEY

AFFIDAVIT AS TO ATTORNEY FEES

03/02/2023: AFFIDAVIT AS TO ATTORNEY FEES

AFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS

03/02/2023: AFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS

AFFIDAVIT NON MILITARY SERVICE AND PROOF OF CLAIM

03/02/2023: AFFIDAVIT NON MILITARY SERVICE AND PROOF OF CLAIM

MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

03/02/2023: MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

NOTICE OF HEARING

03/02/2023: NOTICE OF HEARING

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/29/2023
  • HearingJAWS HEARING; Hearing Time: 09:30 AM; Hearing Location: 800 E. Twiggs St. Tampa, FL 33602 Room 301View Case Hearing Notice for Additional Details, as applicable.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING; Comment: (ZOOM) 06/29/2023 9:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: MIDFLORIDA Credit Union;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT NON MILITARY SERVICE AND PROOF OF CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT AS TO ATTORNEY FEES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Additional Info: Defendant: Armstrong, John Fitzgerald, Jr;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED; Comment: JOHN FITZGERALD ARMSTRONG JR, FEB 7, 2023; Additional Info: Plaintiff: MIDFLORIDA Credit Union;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: Armstrong, John Fitzgerald, Jr;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2023
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2023
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: MIDFLORIDA Credit Union;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: MIDFLORIDA Credit Union;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: MIDFLORIDA Credit Union;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2023
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: MIDFLORIDA Credit Union;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less