This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 01/13/2023 at 07:13:38 (UTC).

Midfirst Bank vs Oudeh, Adhem Nasief

Case Summary

On 05/20/2022 Midfirst Bank filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Oudeh, Adhem Nasief. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Gabbard, X. Jennifer and Gabbard, Jennifer. X. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4238

  • Filing Date:

    05/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Gabbard, X. Jennifer

Gabbard, Jennifer. X

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Midfirst Bank

12425 28Th St North Ste 200

St Petersburg, FL 33716

Defendants

Clerk Of Circuit Court Hillsborough County Florida

Tampa, FL 33602

Hillsborough County A Political Subdivision Of The State Of Florida

Tampa, FL 33602

Oudeh, Adhem Nasief

Riverview, FL 33578-4107

Oudeh, Amjed Nasief

Riverview, FL 33578

Park Creek Of Hillsborough County Homeowners Association, Inc.

St. Petersburg, FL 33702

State Of Florida, Department Of Revenue

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Unknown Spouse Of Adhem Nasief Oudeh

Riverview, FL 33578-4107

Unknown Spouse Of Amjed Nasief Oudeh

Riverview, FL 33578

Unknown Tenant 1

Riverview, FL 33578-4107

Unknown Tenant 2

Riverview, FL 33578-4107

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROSENBERG , ANNA JUDD

Attorney at EXL LEGAL

12425 28Th St N Ste 200

Saint Petersburg, FL 33716

Defendant Attorney

RUSS , SHELBY KIRSTEN

Attorney at HILLSBOROUGH CO., CLERK OF CIR. COURT

419 N Pierce St Rm 140

Tampa, FL 33602

 

Court Documents

LIS PENDENS

05/20/2022: LIS PENDENS

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

10/06/2022: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

NOTICE OF HEARING

09/15/2022: NOTICE OF HEARING

MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

08/23/2022: MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

08/17/2022: DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

08/12/2022: MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY(S)

08/12/2022: NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY(S)

SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED

07/26/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED

20 DAYS SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

07/26/2022: 20 DAYS SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

07/26/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

SUMMONS RETURNED SUBSTITUTE SERVICE

07/26/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED SUBSTITUTE SERVICE

20 DAYS SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

07/26/2022: 20 DAYS SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

20 DAYS SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

07/25/2022: 20 DAYS SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED

07/25/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED

SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED

07/25/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED

SUMMONS RETURNED SUBSTITUTE SERVICE

07/25/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED SUBSTITUTE SERVICE

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

07/25/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

06/03/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

37 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/19/2022
  • HearingJAWS HEARING; Cancelled Comments: Per Judge's Order; Hearing Time: 09:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION; Comment: OF HEARING - 10/19/2022 AT 9:30 AM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Midfirst Bank;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING; Comment: VIA ZOOM OCTOBER 19, 2022@9:30 A.M; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Midfirst Bank;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Comment: CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE ATTCHD; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Midfirst Bank;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; Comment: FINAL- OF FORECLOSURE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Midfirst Bank;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Comment: OF THE AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS TOGETHER WITH BUSINESS RECORDS- ATTACHED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Midfirst Bank;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Comment: AFFIDAVIT OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL AS TO ATTORNEY'S TIME AND COSTS AND AFFIDAVIT AS TO REASONABLE ATTORNEYS' FEES ATTCHD; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Midfirst Bank;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK; Additional Info: Defendant: Oudeh, Adhem Nasief; Defendant: Oudeh, Amjed Nasief; Defendant: Park Creek Of Hillsborough County Homeowners Association, Inc.; Defendant: State Of Florida, Department Of Revenue; Defendant: Unknown Tenant 1;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • JudgementJudgment Code: NDUNP; Judgment Description: NOTICE OF DROPPING UNNAMED PARTY; Judge: Gabbard, Jennifer X

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK; Additional Info: Defendant: Oudeh, Adhem Nasief; Defendant: Oudeh, Amjed Nasief; Defendant: Park Creek Of Hillsborough County Homeowners Association, Inc.; Defendant: State Of Florida, Department Of Revenue; Defendant: Unknown Tenant 1;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
40 More Docket Entries
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStreamlined Differentiated Case Management Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS (RECORDABLE); Additional Info: Defendant: Clerk Of Circuit Court Hillsborough County Florida; Defendant: Hillsborough County A Political Subdivision Of The State Of Florida; Defendant: Oudeh, Adhem Nasief; Defendant: Oudeh, Amjed Nasief; Defendant: Park Creek Of Hillsborough County Homeowners Association, Inc.; Defendant: State Of Florida, Department Of Revenue; Defendant: Unknown Spouse Of Adhem Nasief Oudeh; Defendant: Unknown Spouse Of Amjed Nasief Oudeh; Defendant: Unknown Tenant 1; Defendant: Unknown Tenant 2; Plaintiff: Midfirst Bank;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X8: SUMMONS FOR DEFS "AMJED" & "UNKNOWN SPOUSE FOR AMJED" ISSUED IN ERROR; Additional Info: Defendant: Clerk Of Circuit Court Hillsborough County Florida; Defendant: Hillsborough County A Political Subdivision Of The State Of Florida; Defendant: Oudeh, Adhem Nasief; Defendant: Oudeh, Amjed Nasief; Defendant: Park Creek Of Hillsborough County Homeowners Association, Inc.; Defendant: State Of Florida, Department Of Revenue; Defendant: Unknown Spouse Of Adhem Nasief Oudeh; Defendant: Unknown Spouse Of Amjed Nasief Oudeh;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X8: SUMMONS FOR DEFS "AMJED" & "UNKNOWN SPOUSE FOR AMJED" ISSUED IN ERROR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X8: SUMMONS FOR DEFS "AMJED" & "UNKNOWN SPOUSE FOR AMJED" ISSUED IN ERROR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X8: SUMMONS FOR DEFS "AMJED" & "UNKNOWN SPOUSE FOR AMJED" ISSUED IN ERROR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X8: SUMMONS FOR DEFS "AMJED" & "UNKNOWN SPOUSE FOR AMJED" ISSUED IN ERROR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X8: SUMMONS FOR DEFS "AMJED" & "UNKNOWN SPOUSE FOR AMJED" ISSUED IN ERROR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X8: SUMMONS FOR DEFS "AMJED" & "UNKNOWN SPOUSE FOR AMJED" ISSUED IN ERROR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X8: SUMMONS FOR DEFS "AMJED" & "UNKNOWN SPOUSE FOR AMJED" ISSUED IN ERROR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midfirst Bank is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROSENBERG, ANNA JUDD