This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 12/05/2019 at 12:37:39 (UTC).

MID-AMERICA APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC. vs THOMPSON, SYLVIA

Case Summary

On 01/17/2019 MID-AMERICA APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against THOMPSON, SYLVIA. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Oster, Cynthia. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3769

  • Filing Date:

    01/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Oster, Cynthia

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

INDIGO POINT APARTMENTS

307 S. Fielding Ave

Tampa, FL 33606-4121

MID-AMERICA APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC.

307 S. Fielding Ave

Tampa, FL 33606-4121

Defendant

THOMPSON, SYLVIA

Brandon, FL 33511

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BARRETT , CHARLES VINCENT, III

Attorney at CHARLES V. BARRETT, P.A.

307 S Fielding Ave

Tampa, FL 33606

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

02/21/2019: WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

MOTION AND ORDER FOR IMMEDIATE DEFAULT

02/20/2019: MOTION AND ORDER FOR IMMEDIATE DEFAULT

ORDER ON - TO - FOR

02/07/2019: ORDER ON - TO - FOR

SUMMONS RETURNED POSTED

01/30/2019: SUMMONS RETURNED POSTED

AFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE

01/30/2019: AFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE

MOTION FOR IMMEDIATE DEFAULT

01/30/2019: MOTION FOR IMMEDIATE DEFAULT

E-FILED PROPOSED WRIT OF POSSESSION

01/30/2019: E-FILED PROPOSED WRIT OF POSSESSION

JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION

02/21/2019: JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION

ANSWER NO RENT DEPOSIT

01/29/2019: ANSWER NO RENT DEPOSIT

SUMMONS ISSUED AND MAILED

01/18/2019: SUMMONS ISSUED AND MAILED

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

01/17/2019: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

COMPLAINT

01/17/2019: COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/03/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF POSTED SERVICE RETURNED SERVED; Comment: WRIT OF POSSESSION; Additional Info: Defendant: THOMPSON, SYLVIA; Date 2: 02/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • DocketJUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED; Comment: EMAILED TO ATTY FOR PLTF TO- eservice@barrettpa.com ; Additional Info: Plaintiff: INDIGO POINT APARTMENTS; Plaintiff: MID-AMERICA APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • DocketMOTION AND ORDER FOR IMMEDIATE DEFAULT; Comment: ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR IMMEDIATE DEFAULT; DEFAULT IS ENTERED AGAINST THE DEFENDANT,SYLVIA THOMPSON, as to Count I of PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT. JUDGE C.OSTER 02/20/2019; Additional Info: Date Signed: 02/20/2019; Judicial Officer: Oster, Cynthia

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • DocketORDER ON - TO - FOR; Comment: ACTION TO BE TAKEN AS SET FORTH HEREIN; Additional Info: Defendant: THOMPSON, SYLVIA; Plaintiff: INDIGO POINT APARTMENTS; Plaintiff: MID-AMERICA APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC.; Private Attorney: BARRETT , CHARLES VINCENT, III; Date Signed: 02/06/2019; Judicial Officer: Oster, Cynthia

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED POSTED; Comment: SULVIA THOMPSON, 1/19/19; Additional Info: Plaintiff: INDIGO POINT APARTMENTS; Plaintiff: MID-AMERICA APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: INDIGO POINT APARTMENTS; Plaintiff: MID-AMERICA APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR IMMEDIATE DEFAULT; Comment: AGAINST SYLVIA THOMPSON; Additional Info: Plaintiff: INDIGO POINT APARTMENTS; Plaintiff: MID-AMERICA APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED PROPOSED WRIT OF POSSESSION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: INDIGO POINT APARTMENTS; Plaintiff: MID-AMERICA APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • DocketANSWER NO RENT DEPOSIT; Comment: AND REQUEST FOR HEARING; Additional Info: Defendant: THOMPSON, SYLVIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND MAILED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: MID-AMERICA APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Comment: TAMPA; Additional Info: Plaintiff: INDIGO POINT APARTMENTS; Plaintiff: MID-AMERICA APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: INDIGO POINT APARTMENTS; Plaintiff: MID-AMERICA APARTMENT COMMUNITIES, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • JudgementJudgment Code: NOVD; Judgment Description: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Instrument Number: 2019147311; Judge: Oster, Cynthia

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • JudgementJudgment Code: JFP; Judgment Description: JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION; Instrument Number: 2019085679; Judge: Oster, Cynthia

    Read MoreRead Less