This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 01/16/2023 at 03:21:32 (UTC).

METROPOWER, INC. vs ECOPLEXUS INC.

Case Summary

On 12/09/2022 METROPOWER, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ECOPLEXUS INC. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Gabbard, Jennifer. X, Gabbard, Jennifer X and Gabbard, X. Jennifer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0258

  • Filing Date:

    12/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Gabbard, Jennifer. X

Gabbard, Jennifer X

Gabbard, X. Jennifer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

METROPOWER, INC.

712 S. Oregon Ave.

Tampa, FL 33606

Defendants

ATLANTIC SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

200 E. Gaines Street

Tallahassee, FL 32399

ECOPLEXUS INC.

1201 Hays Street

Tallahassee, FL 32301

THE HANOVER INSURANCE COMPANY

4057 Carmichael Ave.

Jacksonville, FL 32207

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MUELLER , RANDALL PATRICK

Attorney at CAREY OMALLEY WHITAKER MUELLER

712 S Oregon Ave Ste 100

Tampa, FL 33606

Defendant Attorney

MAYTS , ANDREW JOHN, Jr

Attorney at SHUMAKER, LOOP & KENDRICK, LLP

Bank Of America Plaza, Suite 2800 101 E Kennedy Blvd

Tampa, FL 33602

 

Court Documents

MOTION TO DISMISS

01/11/2023: MOTION TO DISMISS

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

01/11/2023: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

01/11/2023: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

LETTER FROM CLERK

01/06/2023: LETTER FROM CLERK

ORDER

01/06/2023: ORDER

ORDER

01/06/2023: ORDER

E-FILED MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE

01/05/2023: E-FILED MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE

E-FILED MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE

01/05/2023: E-FILED MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

12/23/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/09/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

12/09/2022: COMPLAINT

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

12/09/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

12/09/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

12/09/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

12/09/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

12/09/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

12/09/2022: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

12/09/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/25/2023
  • HearingDifferentiated Case Management; Hearing Time: 03:00 PM; Hearing Location: HTTPS://ZOOM.US/J/94004094230 MEETING ID 940 0409 4230; Judicial Officer: Gabbard, Jennifer X

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Comment: RETURN OF SERVICE- ATTACHED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: METROPOWER, INC.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO DISMISS; Additional Info: Defendant: ECOPLEXUS INC.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Additional Info: Defendant: ECOPLEXUS INC.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Additional Info: Defendant: ECOPLEXUS INC.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER TO; Comment: PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY REGARDING PRO HAC VICE FEE OWED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER TO; Comment: PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY REGARDING PRO HAC VICE FEE OWED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER FROM CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER; Comment: GRANTING WARREN N. SAMS, III'S VERIFIED MOTION FOR ADMISSION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: METROPOWER, INC.; Date 2: 01/06/2023; Judicial Officer:: Gabbard, Jennifer X;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER; Comment: RANTING BENJAMIN H. SAWYER'S VERIFIED MOTION FOR ADMISSION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: METROPOWER, INC.; Date 2: 01/06/2023; Judicial Officer:: Gabbard, Jennifer X;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 12/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: METROPOWER, INC.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: METROPOWER, INC.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: METROPOWER, INC.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: METROPOWER, INC.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: METROPOWER, INC.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: METROPOWER, INC.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X3; Additional Info: Defendant: ATLANTIC SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY; Defendant: ECOPLEXUS INC.; Defendant: THE HANOVER INSURANCE COMPANY;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X3

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X3

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less