Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 02/28/2019 at 12:36:18 (UTC).

Messer, Casey vs Ferguson, Daniel

Case Summary

On 03/03/2016 Messer, Casey filed an Other lawsuit against Ferguson, Daniel. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Cook, J.. Martha and Wolfe, Mark. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2064

  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Cook, J.. Martha

Wolfe, Mark

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Counter Defendants

Messer, Michelle

Celebration, FL 34747

Messer, Casey

Celebration, FL 34747

Defendants, 3Rd Party Defendants and 3Rd Party Plaintiffs

Tomasovic, Joseph H

Ferguson, Daniel

Lutz, FL 33549

Tomasovic, Diana E

Defendant, Counter Plaintiff and 3Rd Party Plaintiff

Ferguson, Daniel

Lutz, FL 33549

Defendants and 3Rd Party Defendants

Tomasovic, Joseph H

Tomasovic, Diana E

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

SCHNEIDER , JEFFREY CLARK

201 S Biscayne Blvd Fl 22

Miami, FL 33131

MARTIN , ANTONIO GIOVONNIE

Attorney at MARTIN LAW GROUP, P.L.

Po Box 220

Davenport, FL 33836

Defendant and 3Rd Party Defendant Attorney

CHAMPAGNE , MELISSA NICOLE

Attorney at COMMUNITY LAW & TITLE, P.A.

6601 Memorial Hwy Ste 219

Tampa, FL 33615

 

Court Documents

ORDER GRANTING

12/17/2018: ORDER GRANTING

MOTION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION

11/19/2018: MOTION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

06/19/2018: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

07/14/2017: AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

ANSWER TO THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT

12/02/2016: ANSWER TO THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT

MOTION TO STRIKE

10/25/2016: MOTION TO STRIKE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

09/30/2016: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

08/15/2016: STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

CIVIL COVER SHEET

03/03/2016: CIVIL COVER SHEET

AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING

06/20/2018: AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING

AGREED ORDER

05/30/2018: AGREED ORDER

MOTION TO WITHDRAW

12/27/2017: MOTION TO WITHDRAW

EXHIBIT

08/29/2017: EXHIBIT

NOTICE OF HEARING

10/28/2016: NOTICE OF HEARING

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

09/02/2016: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

09/02/2016: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

08/31/2016: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

20 DAYS SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

03/15/2016: 20 DAYS SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

59 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED; Comment: EMAILED TO PLTF TO- lv@lklsg.com; ep@lklsg.com; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Messer, Casey; Plaintiff: Messer, Michelle

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILED PROPOSED WRIT OF POSSESSION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Messer, Casey

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER GRANTING; Comment: PLAINTIFFS'/COUNTER-DEFENDANTS', CASEY AND MICHELLE MESSER, MOTION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION - **GRANTED** -- 12/17/18 MJC; Additional Info: Counter-Defendant: Messer, Casey; Counter-Defendant: Messer, Michelle; Plaintiff: Messer, Casey; Plaintiff: Messer, Michelle; Date Signed: 12/17/2018; Judicial Officer: Cook, Martha J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC HEARING; Comment: RE-; PLAINTIFFS /COUNTER-DEFENDANTS , CASEY AND MICHELLE MESSER, MOTION FOR FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AS TO DEFENDANT S/COUNTER-PLAINTIFF S, DANIEL FERGUSON, COUNTERCLAIM, AND MOTION FOR WRIT POSSESSION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Messer, Casey

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION; Comment: PLAINTIFFS /COUNTER-DEFENDANTS , CASEY AND MICHELLE MESSER MOTION FOR FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AS TO DEFENDANT S/COUNTER-PLAINTIFF S DANIEL FERGUSON, COUNTERCLAIM, AND; Additional Info: Counter-Defendant: Messer, Casey; Counter-Defendant: Messer, Michelle; Plaintiff: Messer, Casey; Plaintiff: Messer, Michelle

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC HEARING; Comment: PLAINTIFFS /COUNTER-DEFENDANTS , CASEY AND MICHELLE MESSER, MOTION FOR FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AS TO DEFENDANT S/COUNTER-PLAINTIFF S, DANIEL FERGUSON, COUNTERCLAIM, AND MOTION FOR WRIT POSSESSION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Messer, Casey

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER FOR SUBSTITUTION OF; Comment: COUNSEL FOR THIRD PARTY DEFENDANT **GRANTED** 11/14/18 MJC; Additional Info: Third Party Defendant: Tomasovic, Diana E; Third Party Defendant: Tomasovic, Joseph H; Date Signed: 11/14/2018; Judicial Officer: Cook, Martha J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION TO AMEND; Comment: PLAINTIFFS - PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AS TO COUNT II (DECLARATORY RELIEF/QUIET-TITLE) AND COUNT V (NEGLIGENCE) OF AMENDED COMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Messer, Casey

    Read MoreRead Less
103 More Docket Entries
  • 03/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • 20 DAYS SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED; Comment: DANIEL FERGUSON 3/8/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2016
  • FILE HOME LOCATION IS TAMPA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X 1 ANTONIO1.MARTIN@YAHOO.COM ; info@callmartinlawgroup.com ; nrosario@callmartinlawgroup.com

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Judgment Code: FSJ; Judgment Description: FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT; Judge: Cook, Martha J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • Judgment Code: DJ; Judgment Description: DEFAULT JUDGMENT; Instrument Number: 2019072221; Judge: Cook, Martha J.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Martin, Antonio Giovonnie