This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 11/28/2019 at 10:22:42 (UTC).

Meridian Pointe Apartments Ltd vs Dolphin, Nyasia

Case Summary

On 01/17/2019 Meridian Pointe Apartments Ltd filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against Dolphin, Nyasia. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Manning, M. Daryl. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4429

  • Filing Date:

    01/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Manning, M. Daryl

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Meridian Pointe Apartments Ltd

Po Box 62884

Ft. Myers, FL 33906

Defendants

McGill, Robyn

Tampa, FL 33610

Dolphin, Nyasia

Tampa, FL 33610

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WOLK , BRIAN PETER

Attorney at HEIST, WEISSE & WOLK P.A.

5246 Clayton Ct

Fort Myers, FL 33907

 

Court Documents

DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

02/12/2019: DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

02/07/2019: MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

VERIFICATION OF CLAIM AND NON MILITARY

02/07/2019: VERIFICATION OF CLAIM AND NON MILITARY

SUMMONS RETURNED POSTED

02/07/2019: SUMMONS RETURNED POSTED

SUMMONS RETURNED POSTED

02/07/2019: SUMMONS RETURNED POSTED

FINAL JUDGMENT

02/21/2019: FINAL JUDGMENT

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

01/28/2019: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

01/28/2019: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

01/24/2019: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

01/24/2019: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

COMPLAINT

01/17/2019: COMPLAINT

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

01/17/2019: DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/17/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

01/17/2019: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

01/17/2019: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

01/17/2019: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/19/2019
  • RETURNED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • RETURNED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • FINAL JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK; Additional Info: Defendant: Dolphin, Nyasia; Defendant: McGill, Robyn

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK; Additional Info: Defendant: Dolphin, Nyasia; Defendant: McGill, Robyn

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • VERIFICATION OF CLAIM AND NON MILITARY; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Meridian Pointe Apartments Ltd

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS RETURNED POSTED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Meridian Pointe Apartments Ltd

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS RETURNED POSTED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Meridian Pointe Apartments Ltd

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Additional Info: Defendant: Dolphin, Nyasia

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Additional Info: Defendant: McGill, Robyn

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X2; Additional Info: Defendant: Dolphin, Nyasia; Defendant: McGill, Robyn

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • File Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • COMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Meridian Pointe Apartments Ltd

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Meridian Pointe Apartments Ltd

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Meridian Pointe Apartments Ltd

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Meridian Pointe Apartments Ltd

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Meridian Pointe Apartments Ltd

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Meridian Pointe Apartments Ltd

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • Judgment Code: FJ; Judgment Description: FINAL JUDGMENT; Instrument Number: 2019086189; Judge: Manning, Daryl M

    Read MoreRead Less