This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 08/14/2022 at 07:25:37 (UTC).

MELTON & MELTON MARKETING, LLC vs STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 07/01/2022 MELTON MELTON MARKETING, LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Hooi, J. Michael and Hooi, Michael. J. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6968

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Hooi, J. Michael

Hooi, Michael. J

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MELTON & MELTON MARKETING, LLC, d/b/a FIRST CLASS

C/O Ligori & Ligori 1711 West Kennedy Blvd

Tampa, FL 33606

FIRST CLASS AUTO GLASS

INNAMORATO, RALPH

MELTON & MELTON MARKETING, LLC

C/O Ligori & Ligori 1711 West Kennedy Blvd

Tampa, FL 33606

Defendant

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

C/O The Chief Financial Officer 200 East Gaines Street

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TAYLOR , TORREY CLIFFORD

Attorney at LIGORI & LIGORI, P.A.

1711 W Kennedy Blvd

Tampa, FL 33606

Defendant Attorney

MAYER , PAUL JOHN

Attorney at BANKER LOPEZ GASSLER P.A.

360 Central Ave Ste 700

Saint Petersburg, FL 33701

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

07/01/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

07/01/2022: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

07/01/2022: DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

07/01/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

07/01/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

07/01/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

07/06/2022: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

General Differentiated Case Management Order

07/06/2022: General Differentiated Case Management Order

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

07/26/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

08/04/2022: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Additional Info: Defendant: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Comment: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS - ATTACHED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • DocketIDENTIFIED AS AUTO GLASS RELATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • DocketE-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET; Comment: ENTERED IN ERROR; Additional Info: Defendant: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: MELTON & MELTON MARKETING, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: MELTON & MELTON MARKETING, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: MELTON & MELTON MARKETING, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: MELTON & MELTON MARKETING, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: MELTON & MELTON MARKETING, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: MELTON & MELTON MARKETING, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: MELTON & MELTON MARKETING, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FIRST CLASS AUTO GLASS is a litigant

Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TORREY C TAYLOR, ESQ