Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 03/01/2019 at 01:30:13 (UTC).

Meister Property Management LTD vs Wells, Derek E, Sr

Case Summary

On 05/20/2016 Meister Property Management LTD filed an Other lawsuit against Wells, Derek E, Sr. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Rice, G. Elizabeth. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4830

  • Filing Date:

    05/20/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Rice, G. Elizabeth

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Meister Property Management LTD

4830 W Kennedy Blvd Ste 475

Tampa, FL 33609

Defendants, Counter Plaintiffs and 3Rd Party Plaintiffs

Wells, Derek E, Sr

Tampa, FL 33609

Wild Rover Pub and Brewery LLC

4830 W Kennedy Blvd Ste 475

Tampa, FL 33609

Counter Plaintiffs and 3Rd Party Plaintiffs

Wild Rover Pub and Brewer LLC as assignee of Wadsworth Enterprises LLC

Wadsworth, Robert L, II

Wadsworth, Robert L

Wild Rover Pub and Brewery LLC

4830 W Kennedy Blvd Ste 475

Tampa, FL 33609

Wild Rober Pub and Brewery LLC as assignee of Wadsworth Enterprises LLC

3Rd Party Defendants

Meister, Scott B

Meister Property Management Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorney

ROCHA , MICHAEL R

Attorney at PETITT WORRELL ROCHA PLLC

100 N Tampa St Ste 3575

Tampa, FL 33602

Defendant and Counter Plaintiff Attorney

DOGALI , ANTHONY ANDERSON BENTON

Attorney at DOGALI LAW GROUP

401 E Jackson St Ste 1825

Tampa, FL 33602

3Rd Party Defendant Attorney

PORTER , RICHARD GALE, Jr

Attorney at PORTER LAW GROUP, LLC

100 N Tampa St Ste 3575

Tampa, FL 33602-5877

 

Court Documents

MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND

11/08/2017: MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND

MOTION TO DISMISS

01/13/2017: MOTION TO DISMISS

AMENDED

12/19/2016: AMENDED

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

12/19/2016: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF CANCELLING HEARING

11/28/2016: NOTICE OF CANCELLING HEARING

NOTICE OF HEARING

10/27/2016: NOTICE OF HEARING

E-FILED COUNTERCLAIM - $395 FEE ASSESSED

06/27/2016: E-FILED COUNTERCLAIM - $395 FEE ASSESSED

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

05/20/2016: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

05/20/2016: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

01/03/2018: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF FILING

11/08/2017: NOTICE OF FILING

COURT MEMORANDUM

11/29/2016: COURT MEMORANDUM

NOTICE OF HEARING

11/15/2016: NOTICE OF HEARING

MOTION TO DISMISS

10/26/2016: MOTION TO DISMISS

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

07/18/2016: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

AMENDED COUNTERCLAIM

07/18/2016: AMENDED COUNTERCLAIM

COMPLAINT

05/20/2016: COMPLAINT

ORDER OF DISMISSAL

02/10/2018: ORDER OF DISMISSAL

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER OF DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND; Comment: ANSWER TO DEMAND JURY TRIAL; Additional Info: Defendant: Wells, Derek E, Sr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF FILING; Comment: DEREK WELLS AFFIDAVIT IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE JURY TRIAL DEMAND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • AFFIDAVIT IN OPPOSITION; Comment: TO MOTION TO STRIKE JURY TRIAL DEMAND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COPY OF; Comment: ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE (GRANTED AS TO DISCOVERY AND PRETRIAL PURPOSES ONLY) 2/6/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2017
  • ALL PAPERS TRANSFERRED FROM OR TO; Comment: 16-CA-2839 AVAILABLE ON SUMMARY TAB UNDER RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
34 More Docket Entries
  • 05/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X 2 MichaelR@PetittWorrell.com ; Pleadings@PetittWorrell.com

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X 2 MichaelR@PetittWorrell.com ; Pleadings@PetittWorrell.com

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2016
  • FILE HOME LOCATION IS TAMPA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Judgment Code: OGMTF; Judgment Description: ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO - FOR; Instrument Number: 2016467891; Judge: Rice, Elizabeth G

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Judgment Code: ODISM; Judgment Description: ORDER OF DISMISSAL; Instrument Number: 2018062554; Judge: Rice, Elizabeth G

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer DOGALI , ANTHONY ANDERSON BENTON