This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 11/28/2019 at 12:10:44 (UTC).

Medical & Chiropractic Clinic Inc,ONEAL, B vs GEICO General Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 11/12/2018 Medical Chiropractic Clinic Inc,ONEAL, B filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GEICO General Insurance Company. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Ellison, McKee. Alissa. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9940

  • Filing Date:

    11/12/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Ellison, McKee. Alissa

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Medical & Chiropractic Clinic Inc

P.O. Box 15063

St. Petersburg, FL 33733

ONEAL, B

Defendant

GEICO General Insurance Company

C/O Florida Chief Financial Officer As R A 200 East Gaines Street

Tallahassee, FL 32399-4201

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NEFF , CASIM ADAM

Attorney at NEFF INSURANCE LAW, PLLC

4051 27Th Avenue North

St Petersburg, FL 33713

Defendant Attorney

PAFITES , ANDREW JOSEPH GEORGE, Jr

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF DAVID S. DOUGHERTY

Law Office Of David S. Dougherty

Tampa, FL 33607

 

Court Documents

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

11/12/2018: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

11/12/2018: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

11/12/2018: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

11/12/2018: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

11/12/2018: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

11/15/2018: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

02/06/2019: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

02/27/2019: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/26/2019
  • DocketMOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; Comment: - EXHAUSTION OF PIP BENEFITS - AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW; Additional Info: Defendant: GEICO General Insurance Company

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL SETTLEMENT; Additional Info: Defendant: GEICO General Insurance Company

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • DocketMOTION FOR RELIEF; Comment: FROM TECHNICAL ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Defendant: GEICO General Insurance Company

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Defendant: GEICO General Insurance Company

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Defendant: GEICO General Insurance Company

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Medical & Chiropractic Clinic Inc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • DocketANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Medical & Chiropractic Clinic Inc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Medical & Chiropractic Clinic Inc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • DocketREPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Medical & Chiropractic Clinic Inc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Defendant: GEICO General Insurance Company

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 02/27/2019
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Defendant: GEICO General Insurance Company

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Defendant: GEICO General Insurance Company

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: GEICO General Insurance Company

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2018
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Medical & Chiropractic Clinic Inc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Medical & Chiropractic Clinic Inc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2018
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Medical & Chiropractic Clinic Inc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2018
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Medical & Chiropractic Clinic Inc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2018
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Medical & Chiropractic Clinic Inc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less